Gilead Sciences, Inc. v. Apotex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Defendant: Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Cipla Limited, Apotex, Inc., Hetero USA Inc., Laurus Labs Limited, Shilpa Medicare Limited, Hetero Labs Limited, Natco Pharma Limited, Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V and Lupin Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv00189
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Lupin Limited's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-83) filed by Lupin Limited.(Bilson, David)
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Lupin Limited waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 19, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lance E. Wyatt and Andria Rae Crisler for Gilead Sciences, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Laurus Labs Limited waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Natco Pharma Limited waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Cipla Limited waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Apotex, Inc. waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Geoffrey D. Biegler for Gilead Sciences, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
February 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Madelyn McCormick for Gilead Sciences, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
February 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Juanita R. Brooks for Gilead Sciences, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
February 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan E. Singer for Gilead Sciences, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
February 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Megan A. Chacon for Gilead Sciences, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Hetero USA Inc. waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Hetero Labs Limited waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Shilpa Medicare Limited waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.: For Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd. waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (McCann, Douglas)
February 13, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jenny Shmuel for Gilead Sciences, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juanita R. Brooks, Jonathan E. Singer, Geoffrey D. Biegler, Megan A. Chacon, Jenny A. Shmuel, Lance E. Wyatt, Jr., Andria Rae Crisler, Madelyn S. McCormick, and James Yang filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/13/2020. (dlw)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juanita R. Brooks, Jonathan E. Singer, Geoffrey D. Biegler, Megan A. Chacon, Jenny A. Shmuel, Lance E. Wyatt, Jr., Andria Rae Crisler, Madelyn S. McCormick, and James Yang - filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (McCann, Douglas)
February 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 11, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apotex, Inc. on 2/11/2020; Cipla Limited on 2/11/2020; Hetero Labs Limited on 2/11/2020; Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V on 2/11/2020; Hetero USA Inc. on 2/11/2020; Laurus Labs Limited on 2/11/2020; Lupin Limited on 2/11/2020; Natco Pharma Limited on 2/11/2020; Shilpa Medicare Limited on 2/11/2020. (apk)
February 7, 2020 No Summons Issued. (myr)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (myr)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,390,791 ;7,803,788 ;8,754,065 ;9,296,769. (myr)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: See Attachment. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attachment.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: May 5, 2023.(myr)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 PLAINTIFF GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.'S COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Apotex, Inc., Cipla Limited, Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Laurus Labs Limited, Lupin Limited, Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Natco Pharma Limited, Shilpa Medicare Limited, Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2847329.) - filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilead Sciences, Inc. v. Apotex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cipla Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurus Labs Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shilpa Medicare Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natco Pharma Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Grayson P. Sundermeir
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Represented By: Andria Rae Crisler
Represented By: Juanita R. Brooks
Represented By: Madelyn McCormick
Represented By: Jonathan E. Singer
Represented By: Lance E. Wyatt
Represented By: Jenny Shmuel
Represented By: Megan A. Chacon
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Biegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?