Woodal v. Minimally Invasive Surgical and Neuroscience Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Robin Woodal
Defendant: Minimally Invasive Surgical and Neuroscience Center, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00195
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/21/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. If the parties have no disputes about the scheduling order, the Court will not require the parties to appear at a conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/18/2020. (nmf)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Robin Woodal (Herr, Daniel)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Minimally Invasive Surgical and Neuroscience Center, LLC.(Cronin, Laurence)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Minimally Invasive Surgical and Neuroscience Center, LLC - filed by Robin Woodal. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herr, Daniel)
February 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin Woodal. Minimally Invasive Surgical and Neuroscience Center, LLC served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Herr, Daniel)
February 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 10, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Minimally Invasive Surgical and Neuroscience Center, LLC on 2/10/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Minimally Invasive Surgical and Neuroscience Center, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2848176.) - filed by Robin Woodal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodal v. Minimally Invasive Surgical and Neuroscience Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minimally Invasive Surgical and Neuroscience Center, LLC
Represented By: Laurence V. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Woodal
Represented By: Daniel Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?