Vytacera Bio, LLC v. CytomX Therapeutics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vytacera Bio, LLC
Defendant: CytomX Therapeutics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00333
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ronald M. Daignault,Chandran B. Iyer,Michael A. Siem,Oded Burger,Richard Juang for Vytacera Bio, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to May 26, 2020 filed by CytomX Therapeutics, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/26/20. (ntl)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer, Michael A. Siem, Oded Burger and Richard Juang filed by Vytacera Bio, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/26/20. (ntl)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to May 26, 2020 - filed by CytomX Therapeutics, Inc.. (Oakes, Robert)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer, Michael A. Siem, Oded Burger and Richard Juang - filed by Vytacera Bio, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vytacera Bio, LLC. CytomX Therapeutics, Inc. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 5, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to CytomX Therapeutics, Inc. on 3/5/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sam)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Vytacera Bio, LLC. (sam)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,809,504 B2 ;US 9,775,913 B2. (sam)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT- filed with Jury Demand against CytomX Therapeutics, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2870476.) - filed by Vytacera Bio, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vytacera Bio, LLC v. CytomX Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vytacera Bio, LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Represented By: Richard Juang
Represented By: Michael A. Siem
Represented By: Oded Burger
Represented By: Ronald M. Daignault
Represented By: Chandran B. Iyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CytomX Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?