Rucker-Howard v. Corporate Court et al
Petitioner: Marquise K. Rucker-Howard
Respondent: Corporate Court and Court of Common Pleas
Case Number: 1:2020cv00354
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/27/2020. (nmf)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Marquise K. Rucker-Howard. Unclaimed and Unable to forward. (sam)
March 25, 2020 Remark: Case assignment and D.I. #3 sent to Plaintiff's updated address. (lak)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Marquise K. Rucker-Howard. Not deliverable as addressed. (lak)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Marquise K. Rucker-Howard. Not deliverable as addressed. (lak)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The plaintiff shall, within twenty-one days from the date of this order, either: (1) submit a long form (AO Form 239) application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs (in forrna pauperis), or (2) pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 03/19/2020. (apk)
March 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus (NO IFP, NO FEE PAID) - filed by Marquise K. Rucker-Howard. (sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rucker-Howard v. Corporate Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Corporate Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Court of Common Pleas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marquise K. Rucker-Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?