Brown v. Anyanaso et al
Plaintiff: Judeau S. Brown, Jr.
Defendant: Officer Anyanaso and DOC at JTVCC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00370
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 Authorization by Judeau S. Brown, Jr requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (apk)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The plaintiff shall, within thirty days from the date this order is sent, complete, sign and return to the Clerk of Court, the attached authorization form allowing the agency having custody of him to forward the $19.03 initial partial filing fee and subsequent payments to the Clerk of the Court. Failure of the plaintiff to return the signed authorization form within thirty days from the date this order is sent shall result in dismissal of this action without prejudice.. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 03/19/2020. (apk)
March 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Anyanaso, DOC at JTVCC - filed by Judeau S. Brown, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement - by Judeau S. Brown, Jr. (kmd)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Judeau S. Brown, Jr. (kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Anyanaso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Anyanaso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOC at JTVCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judeau S. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?