Estate of Jean L. Gregory v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Jean L. Gregory
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00382
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 CASE CLOSED (ntl)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Estate of Jean L. Gregory as to U.S. Bank, N.A., as securities intermediary (Gouge, Donald)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Estate of Jean L. Gregory as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as securities intermediary (Gouge, Donald)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Corporation Service Company for Wells Fargo, N.A. on April 3, 2020, filed by Estate of Jean L. Gregory. (Gouge, Donald)
March 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 18, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to U.S. Bank, N.A. on 3/18/2020; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 3/18/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2879716.) - filed by Estate of Jean L. Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Jean L. Gregory v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jean L. Gregory
Represented By: Donald L. Gouge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?