August v. Saul
Plaintiff: Todd M. August
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00412
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summonses served on U.S. Attorney General, Commissioner of Social Security, on March 30, 2020, filed by Todd M. August. (Linarducci, Gary)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather)
March 26, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Todd M. August added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout filed by Todd M. August. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/25/2020. (nmf)
March 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout - filed by Todd M. August. (Linarducci, Gary)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses issued (Please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service).(mal)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2883923.) - filed by Todd M. August. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: August v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd M. August
Represented By: Gary C. Linarducci
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?