Southland Royalty Company LLC v. Wamsutter LLC
Plaintiff: Southland Royalty Company LLC
Defendant: Wamsutter LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00465
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 Amended MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Wamsutter LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2020. (Murley, Lucian)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 Amended MOTION to Withdraw Reference - filed by Wamsutter LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murley, Lucian)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SO ORDERED re #4 Stipulation and Consent Order Establishing Briefing Schedule (Set Briefing Schedule: re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference or Amended Motion to Withdraw Reference due on or before 5/22/2020 - Answering Brief due 6/5/2020. Reply Brief due 6/12/2020). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/29/2020. (dlw)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION and Consent Order Establishing Briefing Schedule re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Southland Royalty Company LLC. (Justison, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/29/2020 (dlw).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 Stipulation and Consent Order Establishing Briefing Schedule (Set Briefing Schedule: re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference - Answering Brief due 4/29/2020. Reply Brief due 5/14/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/14/2020. (dlw)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION Consent Order Establishing Briefing Schedule re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Southland Royalty Company LLC. (Justison, Elizabeth)
April 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 2, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (amf)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Withdrawal record from case number AP 20-50551 (KBO) (amf)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference - filed by Wamsutter LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Opening Brief in Support, #4 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(amf)
April 2, 2020 Adversary Cause of Action: Recovery of Money/Property. (amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southland Royalty Company LLC v. Wamsutter LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wamsutter LLC
Represented By: Lucian Borders Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southland Royalty Company LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Soper Justison
Represented By: Sean M. Beach
Represented By: M. Blake Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?