Stormborn Technologies LLC v. NEXGO, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: NEXGO, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00529
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Having reviewed #9 Defendant's letter requesting an extension of time, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall contact Defendant to determine an appropriate date by which Defendant is to respond to the Complaint and shall file a stipulation extending time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, any future correspondence to the Court by Defendant must be through counsel and must meet the requirements of the Local Rules of this Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/2/2020. ***Copy mailed to Defendant on 6/2/2020 at the address on the letterhead of D.I. 9*** (dlw)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by NEXGO, Inc. (kmd)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. NEXGO, Inc. served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/28/2020. (Chong, Jimmy)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 06/28/2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: NEXGO, Inc. answer due 6/28/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/28/2020. (dlw)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer complaint to 06/28/2020 - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
May 5, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Stormborn Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L Wernow filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/5/2020. (dlw)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L Wernow - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
April 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (myr)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. RE44,199 E. (myr)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against NEXGO, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2903950.) - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. NEXGO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEXGO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?