Estate of Edward Albart et al v. Lavastone Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edward Albart Revocable Living Trust and Estate of Edward Albart
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. and Lavastone Capital LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00608
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Miller on behalf of Edward Albart Revocable Living Trust, Estate of Edward Albart (Miller, Daniel)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to July 31, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lavastone Capital LLC answer due 7/31/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/22/2020. (nms)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to July 31, 2020 - filed by Lavastone Capital LLC. (Cascio, Megan)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to June 30, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lavastone Capital LLC answer due 6/30/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/27/2020. (nms)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to June 30, 2020 - filed by Lavastone Capital LLC. (Cascio, Megan)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Julius A. Rousseau, III, Esquire on May 8, 2020, filed by Estate of Edward Albart. (Gouge, Donald)
May 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Lavastone Capital LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2915216.) - filed by Estate of Edward Albart, Edward Albart Revocable Living Trust dated April 5, 2001. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Edward Albart et al v. Lavastone Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavastone Capital LLC
Represented By: Megan Ward Cascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Albart Revocable Living Trust
Represented By: Donald L. Gouge, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Edward Albart
Represented By: Donald L. Gouge, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?