Rodriguez v. Wendover, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anna Rodriguez
Defendant: Wendover, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00620
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Amended Complaint to July 30, 2020 filed by Wendover, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Wendover, Inc. answer due 7/30/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/30/2020. (fms)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Amended Complaint to July 30, 2020 - filed by Wendover, Inc.. (Guerke, Kevin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Rodriguez. Wendover, Inc. served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Fletcher, William)
May 28, 2020 Remark: The amended summons form attached to the Amended Complaint at D.I. #4 has been removed from the docket and will not be issued. In an effort to reduce the handling of paper copies, the District Court has created an Electronic Civil Summons form (AO 440) for Counsel to complete and use without requiring the Clerk to print, sign, seal and handle the originals. Counsel should complete and use the summons form without requiring the Clerk to print, sign, and seal. Please call the Clerk's office at 302-573-6170 with any questions regarding this procedure. (fms) (fms)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wendover, Inc.- filed by Anna Rodriguez. (Fletcher, William) Modified on 5/28/2020 (fms).
May 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Wendover, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2921900.) - filed by Anna Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Wendover, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendover, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Rodriguez
Represented By: Dianna E. Louder
Represented By: William D. Fletcher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?