Dorsey v. Christina School District of the State of Delaware
Plaintiff: Sheila Y. Dorsey
Defendant: Christina School District of the State of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2020cv00626
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Christina School District of the State of Delaware: For Christina School District of the State of Delaware waiver sent on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Russell, Lauren)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adria Benner Martinelli on behalf of Christina School District of the State of Delaware (Martinelli, Adria)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Stafford on behalf of Christina School District of the State of Delaware (Stafford, Michael)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell on behalf of Christina School District of the State of Delaware (Russell, Lauren)
May 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 11, 2020 No Summons Issued. (sam)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Christina School District of the State of Delaware - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2924068.) - filed by Sheila Y. Dorsey.(sam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. Christina School District of the State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Y. Dorsey
Represented By: Victor F. Battaglia, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina School District of the State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?