Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc. v. Hilton Franchise Holding LLC
Plaintiff: Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc.
Defendant: Hilton Franchise Holding LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00759
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hilton Franchise Holding LLC - filed by Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to M)(Holly, Timothy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. for Hilton Franchise Holding LLC filed by Hilton Franchise Holding LLC. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hilton Franchise Holding LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/3/2020. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Hilton Franchise Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moyer, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc..(Holly, Timothy)
July 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John D. Wilburn for Hilton Franchise Holding LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John D. Wilburn and Ryan D. Frei filed by Hilton Franchise Holding LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/16/20. (ntl)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John D. Wilburn and Ryan D. Frei - filed by Hilton Franchise Holding LLC. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Hilton Franchise Holding LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Mechanical Contractors' Complaint to through and including July 20, 2020 filed by Hilton Franchise Holding LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/24/20. (ntl)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Hilton Franchise Holding LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Mechanical Contractors' Complaint to through and including July 20, 2020 - filed by Hilton Franchise Holding LLC. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler E. Cragg on behalf of Hilton Franchise Holding LLC (Cragg, Tyler)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Moyer on behalf of Hilton Franchise Holding LLC (Moyer, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward T. Kang for Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward T. Kang filed by Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/15/20. (ntl)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc.. Hilton Franchise Holding LLC served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Holly, Timothy)
June 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward T. Kang - filed by Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc.. (Holly, Timothy)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc.. (myr)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Hilton Franchise Holding LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2976392.) - filed by Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc. v. Hilton Franchise Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Franchise Holding LLC
Represented By: John D. Wilburn
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechanical Contractors Association of America, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Michael Holly
Represented By: Edward T. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?