BIAL - PORTELA & CA. S.A. v. Apotex Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Bial - Holding, S.A., BIAL - PORTELA & CA. S.A. and Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant: Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00785
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Christopher J Burke
Referring Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Feldman, Receipt Number 074489 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Tancredi, Damien)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sherry L. Rollo, Receipt Number 074489 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Tancredi, Damien)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Herve Jacquiau, Receipt Number 074489 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Tancredi, Damien)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Damien Nicholas Tancredi on behalf of Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tancredi, Damien)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Feldman, Receipt Number 074489 filed by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp., #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sherry L. Rollo, Receipt Number 074489 filed by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp., #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Herve Jacquiau, Receipt Number 074489 filed by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/27/2020. (fms)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for all disputes relating to discovery or the protective order. Joinder of Parties due by 12/18/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2020. Fact Discovery completed by 1/29/2021. Expert Discovery due by 7/16/2021. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 1/5/2021. A Markman Hearing is set for 2/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2021. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/14/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Bench Trial is set for 9/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/20/2020. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00279-CFC-CJB et al.(nmf)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (136 in 1:18-cv-00312-CFC-CJB, 133 in 1:18-cv-00336-CFC-CJB, 136 in 1:18-cv-00341-CFC-CJB, 12 in 1:20-cv-00781-CFC, 148 in 1:18-cv-00382-CFC-CJB, 146 in 1:18-cv-00279-CFC-CJB, 132 in 1:18-cv-00342-CFC-CJB, 9 in 1:20-cv-00784-CFC, 11 in 1:20-cv-00780-CFC, 134 in 1:18-cv-00304-CFC-CJB, 9 in 1:20-cv-00785-CFC, 9 in 1:20-cv-00782-CFC, 9 in 1:20-cv-00783-CFC, 9 in 1:20-cv-00786-CFC) [SEALED] STIPULATION Regarding Case Management of Original and Newly Filed Actions. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/20/2020. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00279-CFC-CJB et al.(nmf)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 [SEALED] STIPULATION Regarding Case Management of Original and Newly Filed Actions, by Bial - Holding, S.A., Bial - Portela & CA S.A., BIAL - PORTELA & CA. S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Balick, Steven)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,695,354 ;10,702,536 . (Balick, Steven)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 Amended Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: N/A. Date of Expiration of Patent: 5/6/2025.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 5/8/2021. (Balick, Steven)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by BIAL - PORTELA & CA. S.A., Bial - Holding, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Balick, Steven)
June 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00780-CFC through 1:20-cv-00786-CFC (rjb)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent No parent corporations for Bial - Holding, S.A.; Corporate Parent Bial - Holding, S.A. for BIAL - PORTELA & CA. S.A.; Corporate Parent Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co. Ltd. for Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by BIAL - PORTELA & CA. S.A., Bial - Holding, S.A., Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 10, 2020 No Summons Issued. (lak)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,675,287. (lak)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: N/A. Date of Expiration of Patent: 5/6/2025.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 5/8/2021. (lak)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2983481.) - filed by BIAL - PORTELA & CA. S.A., Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bial - Holding, S.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIAL - PORTELA & CA. S.A. v. Apotex Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bial - Holding, S.A.
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jennifer Ying
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIAL - PORTELA & CA. S.A.
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jennifer Ying
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jennifer Ying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?