Organically Grown Company et al v. Social Enterprise LLC et al
Plaintiff: Organically Grown Company, Always Fresh Farms, LLC and Bridges Produce, Inc.
Defendant: Paul Austin, Alex Portilla, Social Enterprise LLC, Diego Gonzalez-Carvajal, Federico Dumais, Rafael Goldberg and Social Enterprise LLC a New York limited liability company doing business as Interrupcion Fair Trade
Case Number: 1:2020cv00789
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Bridges Produce, Inc., Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Organically Grown Company. Alex Portilla served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Hazeltine, William)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Bridges Produce, Inc., Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Organically Grown Company. Social Enterprise LLC served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Hazeltine, William)
June 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Bridges Produce, Inc., Organically Grown Company. (sam)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Paul Austin, Federico Dumais, Rafael Goldberg, Diego Gonzalez-Carvajal, Alex Portilla, Social Enterprise LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2986064.) - filed by Bridges Produce, Inc., Always Fresh Farms, LLC, Organically Grown Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Organically Grown Company et al v. Social Enterprise LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Portilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Enterprise LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diego Gonzalez-Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federico Dumais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Enterprise LLC a New York limited liability company doing business as Interrupcion Fair Trade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organically Grown Company
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Always Fresh Farms, LLC
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridges Produce, Inc.
Represented By: William Anthony Hazeltine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?