In Re: Boy Scouts of America et al
Appellee: Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC and Sidley Austin LLP
Appellant: Century Indemnity Company
Debtor: Boy Scouts of America et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv00798
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORAL ORDER: The Consented to Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Appeal Brief (D.I. #15 ) is DISMISSED as moot. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/22/2020. (nms)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time (*Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2020, Appellee Brief due by 9/30/2020, Appellant Reply Brief due by 10/14/2020) (see Footnote for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/22/2020. (nms)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James W. Ducayet, Esq. and Robert N. Hochman, Esq., filed by Sidley Austin LLP. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/14/2020. (nms)
July 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James W. Ducayet, Esq. and Robert N. Hochman, Esq. - filed by Sidley Austin LLP. (Simon, Christopher)
July 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Simon and Kevin Scott Mann on behalf of Sidley Austin LLP. (Mann, Kevin) Modified on 7/15/2020 (nms).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Amended Notice of Appeal, Appealing the Order entered on 06/02/2020 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343(LSS). Fee Status Paid - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Stamatios Stamoulis, regarding requests for extension. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms).
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Jonathan Hacker re #15 Consented to Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Brief, by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms).
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENTED to Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Appeal Brief - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms).
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms).
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 Designation of Additional Items to Be Included in the Record Pursuant to Rule 8009 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Moats, Eric) Modified on 7/10/2020 (nms).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying #5 MOTION to Accept Documents Under Seal Into Appellate Record. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/8/2020. (nms)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #5 MOTION to Accept Documents Under Seal Into Appellate Record, by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/7/2020 (nms).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2020. (nms)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SO ORDERED Granting #7 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2020. (nms)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Janine Panchok-Berry, Tancred Schiavoni, and Andrew Kirschenbaum, filed by Century Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2020. (nms)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Janine Panchok-Berry, Tancred Schiavoni, and Andrew Kirschenbaum - filed by Century Indemnity Company, Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Hacker, filed by Century Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/30/2020. (nms)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/30/20. (cak)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Hacker - filed by Century Indemnity Company, Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 26, 2020 LOCAL RULE 7.1.1 NOTICE: In accordance with Local Rule 7.1.1, except for civil cases involving pro se parties or motions brought by nonparties, every nondispositive motion shall be accompanied by an averment of counsel for the moving party that a reasonable effort has been made to reach agreement with the opposing party on the matters set forth in the motion. Unless otherwise ordered, failure to so aver may result in dismissal of the motion. The records of this case do not reflect such an averment by counsel for DI #5 . Please file the averment using the event code STATEMENT, found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. (nms)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Accept Documents Under Seal Into Appellate Record - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 6/26/2020 (nms).
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal, filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit , #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 6/26/2020 (nms).
June 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Friday, June 26, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/12/20. (cak)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (sam)
June 12, 2020 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (sam)
June 12, 2020 No Designation of Record Filed. (sam) Modified on 6/17/2020 (nms).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Appeal, Appealing the Order entered on 06/02/2020 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy Case Number 20-10343(LSS). *Fee Status Paid - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Bench Ruling, #2 Order, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(sam) Modified on 6/17/2020 (nms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Boy Scouts of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Derek C. Abbott
Represented By: Eric W. Moats
Represented By: Andrew R. Remming
Represented By: Joseph Charles Barsalona, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Delaware BSA, LLC
Represented By: Derek C. Abbott
Represented By: Eric W. Moats
Represented By: Andrew R. Remming
Represented By: Joseph Charles Barsalona, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sidley Austin LLP
Represented By: Kevin Scott Mann
Represented By: Christopher Page Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Century Indemnity Company
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Boy Scouts of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?