In re CURO Group Holdings Corp. Derivative Litigation
Plaintiff: Melvyn Klein, John Watt and Patrick Ayers
Defendant: Mike McKnight, Gillian Van Schaick, Dale E. Williams, Chris Masto, Doug Rippel, Donald F. Gayhardt, Andrew Frawley, William Baker, Chad Faulkner, Karen Winterhof, Roger W. Dean, Elizabeth Webster, David M. Kirchheimer, Friedman Fleischer & Lowe Capital Partners II, L.P., FFL Parallel Fund II, L.P. and FFL Executive Partners II, L.P.
Nominal Defendant: CURO Group Holdings Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00851
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna J. Cline on behalf of All Defendants (Cline, Joanna)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Brian Chuff on behalf of All Defendants (Chuff, Christopher)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (3 in 1:20-cv-00904-LPS, 5 in 1:20-cv-00851-LPS, 3 in 1:20-cv-00954-LPS) JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND ESTABLISHING A LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/6/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00851-LPS, 1:20-cv-00904-LPS, 1:20-cv-00954-LPS (ntl)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Stockholder Derivative Actions and Establishing a Leadership Structure by Patrick Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Serra, Gina)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvyn Klein. CURO Group Holdings Corp. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Ernst, Ryan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE filed by Ryan M. Ernst on behalf of Melvyn Klein requesting Clerk to issue summonses as to all defendants. (Ernst, Ryan)
July 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 25, 2020 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against William Baker, CURO Group Holdings Corp., Roger W. Dean, Chad Faulkner, Andrew Frawley, Donald F. Gayhardt, David M. Kirchheimer, Chris Masto, Mike McKnight - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3018810.) - filed by Melvyn Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re CURO Group Holdings Corp. Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McKnight
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gillian Van Schaick
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale E. Williams
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Masto
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Rippel
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald F. Gayhardt
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Frawley
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Baker
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Faulkner
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Winterhof
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger W. Dean
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Webster
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Kirchheimer
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friedman Fleischer & Lowe Capital Partners II, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FFL Parallel Fund II, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FFL Executive Partners II, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: CURO Group Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvyn Klein
Represented By: Ryan M. Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Watt
Represented By: Seth D. Rigrodsky
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ayers
Represented By: Seth D. Rigrodsky
Represented By: Brian D. Long
Represented By: Gina M. Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?