Manhattan Telecommunications Corp. v. Granite Telecommunications, LLC
Plaintiff: Manhattan Telecommunications Corp., MetTel and Manhattan Telecommunications Corp. doing business as Metropolitan Telecommunications also known as MetTel
Defendant: Granite Telecommunications, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00857
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Dana B. Parker and Charles F. Rysavy for Manhattan Telecommunications Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dana B. Parker and Charles F. Rysavy filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/20/2020. (nmf)
August 18, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dana B. Parker and Charles F. Rysavy - filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.. (Caponi, Steven)
August 11, 2020 Filing 61 REDACTED VERSION of #48 Reply Brief, in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
August 11, 2020 Filing 60 REDACTED VERSION of #50 Reply Brief, in Support of Motion to Transfer by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
August 11, 2020 Filing 59 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
August 7, 2020 Filing 58 REDACTED VERSION of #44 Reply Brief by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.. (Caponi, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 57 APPENDIX re #56 Reply to Response to Motion, by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
August 7, 2020 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION for Costs of Previously Dismissed Action Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(d) filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
August 6, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, or Alternatively, for Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 D. Del. L.R. 7.1.1. Certification, #3 Certificate of Compliance, #4 Exhibit A)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
August 5, 2020 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Seal filed by Eugene Volokh. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Rice, Richard)
August 5, 2020 Filing 53 REDACTED VERSION of #39 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.. (Caponi, Steven)
August 5, 2020 Filing 52 REDACTED VERSION of #40 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.. (Caponi, Steven)
August 5, 2020 Filing 51 APPENDIX re #50 Reply Brief, by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
August 5, 2020 Filing 50 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts or in the alternative the Southern District of New York filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
August 5, 2020 Filing 49 APPENDIX re #48 Reply Brief, by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
August 5, 2020 Filing 48 SEALED REPLY BRIEF - Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss , #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby) Modified on 8/5/2020 (rwc).
August 5, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Seal Document: Reply Briefs in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification, #3 Certificate of Compliance)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
August 5, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Modified DI 48, removed link to DI 47. (rwc)
July 31, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION for Costs of Previously Dismissed Action Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(d) filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of A. Gage Whirley by Granite Telecommunications, LLC (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 31, 2020 Filing 44 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Stay filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 42 REDACTED VERSION of #33 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 31, 2020 Filing 41 REDACTED VERSION of #34 Affidavit, by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 30, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joshua N. Ruby for Granite Telecommunications, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 29, 2020 Filing 40 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 39 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts or in the alternative the Southern District of New York filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven)
July 24, 2020 Filing 38 APPENDIX re #33 Answering Brief in Opposition, Or Alternatively, For Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 24, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Seal - filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #3 Certificate of Compliance, #4 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven)
July 24, 2020 Filing 36 APPENDIX re #35 Response to Motion to Stay by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 24, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Stay filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 24, 2020 Filing 34 [SEALED] AFFIDAVIT of Larry Antonellis re #33 Answering Brief in Opposition, Or Alternatively, For Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 24, 2020 Filing 33 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Or Alternatively, For Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Compliance)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 24, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Seal Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, or Alternatively, for Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery and the Affidavit of Larry Antonellis - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 D. Del. L.R. 7.1.1. Certification)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 22, 2020 Filing 31 Letter to the Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Steven L. Caponi regarding Motion to Expedite. (Caponi, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay - filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #3 Certificate of Compliance, #4 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 29 REDACTED VERSION of #17 Opening Brief in Support, of Motion to Dismiss by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 22, 2020 Filing 28 REDACTED VERSION of #17 Opening Brief in Support, of Motion to Transfer by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 22, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Unseal the Following Document(s): #3 Exhibit to a Document filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC filed by Eugene Volokh. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Request for Oral Argument)(Rice, Richard)
July 20, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 13 Brief placed under seal per request of filer. (rwc)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION to Seal Briefs in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/20/2020. (nmf)
July 17, 2020 Filing 26 Joint STATEMENT re #24 MOTION for Costs of Previously Dismissed Action Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(d), #12 MOTION to Remand , #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts or in the alternative the Southern District of New York, #7 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Unseal the Following Document(s): #3 Exhibit to a Document filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC , #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 17, 2020 Filing 25 APPENDIX re #24 MOTION for Costs of Previously Dismissed Action Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(d) by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 17, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Costs of Previously Dismissed Action Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(d) - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification, #3 Certificate of Compliance)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 23 APPENDIX re #22 Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 21 APPENDIX re #20 Opening Brief in Support, of Motion to Transfer by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 20 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts or in the alternative the Southern District of New York filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts or in the alternative the Southern District of New York - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 APPENDIX re #17 Opening Brief in Support, of Motion to Dismiss by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Seal Briefs in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification, #3 Certificate of Compliance)(Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Unseal the Following Document(s): #3 Exhibit to a Document filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Caponi, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand or Alternatively, For Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Certificate of Compliance, #6 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 7/20/2020 (rwc).
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand - filed by Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Caponi, Steven)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Motion to Expedite to 07/15/2020 - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Donnelly and Joshua N. Ruby - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Whirley, A. Gage)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Donnelly and Joshua N. Ruby filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/7/2020. (fms)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Motion to Expedite to 07/15/2020 filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/7/2020. (fms)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 2 by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Grzaslewicz, Barnaby)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Unseal the Following Document(s): #3 Exhibit to a Document filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC filed by Eugene Volokh.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Rice, Richard)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to Unseal the Following Document(s): #3 Exhibit to a Document filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC - filed by Eugene Volokh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification)(Rice, Richard)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Garrett Rice on behalf of Eugene Volokh (Rice, Richard)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 2 to the Notice of Removal Under Seal. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/29/2020. (nmg)
June 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg)
June 26, 2020 Remark: Exit Copies to Duty Judge (CFC). (nmg)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 [SEALED] EXHIBIT 2 re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (nmg)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Ct, Case Number 2020-0468-JRS (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3021829)- filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 2 to the Notice of Removal Under Seal - filed by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manhattan Telecommunications Corp. v. Granite Telecommunications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manhattan Telecommunications Corp.
Represented By: Matthew B. Goeller
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MetTel
Represented By: Matthew B. Goeller
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Represented By: Charles F. Rysavy
Represented By: Dana B. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manhattan Telecommunications Corp. doing business as Metropolitan Telecommunications also known as MetTel
Represented By: Matthew B. Goeller
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Represented By: Charles F. Rysavy
Represented By: Dana B. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Telecommunications, LLC
Represented By: Barnaby Grzaslewicz
Represented By: Rudolph J. Scaggs, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua N. Ruby
Represented By: A. Gage Whirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?