Valyrian IP LLC v. RCN Telecom Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Valyrian IP LLC
Defendant: RCN Telecom Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00877
Filed: June 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to September 8, 2020 filed by RCN Telecom Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/24/20. (ntl)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant RCN Telecom Services, LLC to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to September 8, 2020 - filed by RCN Telecom Services, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard L. Brophy and Zachary C. Howenstine filed by RCN Telecom Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/23/20. (ntl)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard L. Brophy and Zachary C. Howenstine - filed by RCN Telecom Services, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendant to respond to the Complaint to August 24, 2020 filed by RCN Telecom Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/22/20. (ntl)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendant to respond to the Complaint to August 24, 2020 - filed by RCN Telecom Services, LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valyrian IP LLC. RCN Telecom Services, LLC served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. (Chong, Jimmy)
July 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RCN Telecom Services, LLC on 6/29/2020. (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (lak)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,970,706. (lak)
June 28, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Valyrian IP LLC. (lak)
June 28, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
June 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against RCN Telecom Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3023268.) - filed by Valyrian IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valyrian IP LLC v. RCN Telecom Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valyrian IP LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN Telecom Services, LLC
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?