Victaulic Company v. Anvil International, LLC
Plaintiff: Victaulic Company
Defendant: Anvil International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00887
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Kenneth E. Keller, Colin T. Kemp, Christopher E. Stretch, Alekzandir Morton, Bryan P. Collins, Benjamin L. Kiersz for Victaulic Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION to Seal Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Anvil International, LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/25/2020. (fms)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATEMENT re #9 MOTION to Seal Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims - Certification pursuant to D. Del. Local Rule 7.1.1 by Anvil International, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order LOCAL RULE 7.1.1 NOTICE: In accordance with Local Rule 7.1.1, except for civil cases involving pro se parties or motions brought by nonparties, every nondispositive motion shall be accompanied by an averment of counsel for the moving party that a reasonable effort has been made to reach agreement with the opposing party on the matters set forth in the motion. Unless otherwise ordered, failure to so aver may result in dismissal of the motion. The records of this case do not reflect such an averment by counsel for DI #9 . Please file the averment using the event code STATEMENT, found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. (fms)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent OEP Pioneer LLC for Anvil International, LLC filed by Anvil International, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 [SEALED] ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Victaulic Company by Anvil International, LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims - filed by Anvil International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME respond to complaint to August 20, 2020 filed by Anvil International, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Anvil International, LLC answer due 8/20/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/13/2020. (fms)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME respond to complaint to August 20, 2020 - filed by Anvil International, LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth E. Keller, Colin T. Kemp, Christopher E. Stretch, Alekzandir Morton, Bryan P. Collins, and Benjamin L. Kiersz - filed by Victaulic Company. (Egan, Brian)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth E. Keller, Colin T. Kemp, Christopher E. Stretch, Alekzandir Morton, Bryan P. Collins, and Benjamin L. Kiersz filed by Victaulic Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/7/2020. (fms)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victaulic Company. Anvil International, LLC served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Egan, Brian)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Victaulic Company. (mal)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,712,796 B2 ;10,458,579 B2 ;10,627,025 B2. (mal)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Anvil International, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3026327.) - filed by Victaulic Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victaulic Company v. Anvil International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victaulic Company
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Andrew Mark Moshos
Represented By: Bryan P. Collins
Represented By: Alekzandir Morton
Represented By: Christopher E. Stretch
Represented By: Colin T. Kemp
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Represented By: Benjamin L. Kiersz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anvil International, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?