In Re: TK Holdings Inc., et al.
Debtor: TK Holdings Inc., et al.
Appellee: Automotive Coalition For Traffic Safety, Inc.
Appellant: Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00896
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2020. (nms)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SO ORDERED Granting #12 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2020. (nms)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/30/20. (cak)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 Amended Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order of Final Judgment, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105 and 107(b) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(f) and 8013 Accepting Under Seal Documents Designated for Inclusion in Record on Appeal (D.I. #9 ) is DENIED (see "Avandia"). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/20/2020. (nms)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105 and 107(b) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(f) and 8013 Accepting Under Seal Documents Designated for Inclusion in Record on Appeal - filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #4 Certificate of Service)(Beebe, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Ningbo Joyson Electronic Corp. for Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Beebe, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal, filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beebe, Matthew) Modified on 7/15/2020 (nms).
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF ISSUES on Appeal filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC (Beebe, Matthew)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda D. Mettes, filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC, and #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Angileri, filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/10/2020. (nms)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda D. Mettes - filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Beebe, Matthew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Angileri - filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Beebe, Matthew)
July 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Monday, July 27, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/6/20. (cak)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg)
July 1, 2020 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (nmg)
July 1, 2020 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (nmg)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 6/18/2020 by Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 18-50274. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: TK Holdings Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: TK Holdings Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Automotive Coalition For Traffic Safety, Inc.
Represented By: Sally Elaine Veghte
Represented By: Richard M. Beck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joyson Safety Systems Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Michael Jason Barrie
Represented By: Matthew D. Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?