Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd v. Svensrud et al
Plaintiff: Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd
Defendant: Mogotani Fast Corporation, Christopher Svensrud and Jason Drew
Nominal Defendant: Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00936
Filed: July 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Christopher J Burke
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Approving Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/27/2020. (nms)
July 27, 2020 Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re D.I. #25 Emergency Motion to Approve Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/27/2020. (dlb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 27 Letter to the Honorable Judge Christopher J. Burke, from Chad J. Toms, regarding no opposition to Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #25 ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Report and Recommendation)(Toms, Chad) Modified on 7/27/2020 (nms).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORAL ORDER: The referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon (D.I. 12 ) is now WITHDRAWN. The case is now REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/27/2020. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(nms)
July 27, 2020 Filing 25 Emergency Motion to Approve Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice - filed by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Report and Recommendation)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Toms, Chad) Modified on 7/27/2020 (nms).
July 27, 2020 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mogotani Fast Corporation. (Schiltz, Todd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Svensrud in Support of 12 Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, filed by Jason Drew, Mogotani Fast Corporation, Christopher Svensrud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Schiltz, Todd) Modified on 7/24/2020 (nms).
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, filed by Jason Drew, Mogotani Fast Corporation, Christopher Svensrud. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schiltz, Todd) Modified on 7/24/2020 (nms).
July 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd C. Schiltz on behalf of Jason Drew, Mogotani Fast Corporation, Christopher Svensrud (Schiltz, Todd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Oral Order entered July 21, 2020 served on Mogotani Fast Corporation on 7/23/2020, filed by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Toms, Chad)
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Oral Order entered July 21, 2020 served on Christopher Svensrud on 7/23/2020, filed by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Toms, Chad)
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Oral Order entered July 21, 2020 served on Jason Drew on 7/22/2020, filed by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Toms, Chad)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Having received Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction and related materials (see D.I. #6 , #7 , #8 , #10 , #11 , #14 ) and letter requesting an emergency hearing (see D.I #13 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (i) Defendants shall file a responsive brief no later than Friday, July 24, 2020; (ii) Plaintiff shall file a reply brief no later than Wednesday, July 29, 2020; (iii) the Court will hold a teleconference to hear argument on the pending motion on Monday, August 3, 2020 beginning at 2:00 p.m.; and (iv) Plaintiff shall ensure that, to the extent it has not occurred already, Defendants are served with the complaint, motion, supporting materials, and this Order as soon as possible. Briefing and page limitations shall comply with the Local Rules. Any slide presentations the parties plan on using during the hearing should be emailed (in PDF format) to Rebecca Polito at rebecca_polito@ded.uscourts.gov by no later than 11:00 AM on 7/31/2020. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/21/2020. (lih)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd, Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC. Christopher Svensrud served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Toms, Chad)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd, Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC. Mogotani Fast Corporation served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Toms, Chad)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd, Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC. Jason Drew served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Toms, Chad)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 Third DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H)(Toms, Chad)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 Letter to the Honorable Judge Sherry R. Fallon, from Chad J. Toms, regarding Rule 65(b) Certification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Toms, Chad) Modified on 7/17/2020 (nms).
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER: The case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/15/2020. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(nms)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Toms, Chad)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/29/2020. (Toms, Chad)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Toms, Chad)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 Second Declaration of Bingbing ("Eva") Zhang re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F)(Toms, Chad) Modified on 7/15/2020 (nms).
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION Pursuant to Rule 65(b)(1)(B), by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Toms, Chad) Modified on 7/15/2020 (nms).
July 15, 2020 Remark : Reviewed by Duty Judge, case submitted for routine judicial case assignment (after 2pm this afternoon). (rwc)
July 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. McCann, Jr., filed by Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan J. McGinnis, filed by Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/15/2020. (nms)
July 15, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The brief and declaration filed as attachments to the motion at D.I. 6 have been removed from that filing. Motions, briefs and declarations are to be filed independent from each other. Counsel is to refile the brief and declaration accordingly. (nms)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction - filed by Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC, Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Attachments: #8 Proposed Order, #9Proposed Order, #10 Request for Emergency Hearing)(Toms, Chad) Modified on 7/15/2020 (nms).
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan J. McGinnis - filed by Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Toms, Chad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. McCann, Jr. - filed by Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Toms, Chad)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Toms, Chad)
July 13, 2020 No Summons Issued. (amf)
July 11, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
July 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES - filed against Jason Drew, Mogotani Fast Corporation, Christopher Svensrud - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3055332.) - filed by Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Verification, #23 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd v. Svensrud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mogotani Fast Corporation
Represented By: Todd C. Schiltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Svensrud
Represented By: Todd C. Schiltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Drew
Represented By: Todd C. Schiltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cocam Int'l Enterprises, Ltd
Represented By: Chad J. Toms
Represented By: Kaan Ekiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Advanced Outdoor Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Chad J. Toms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?