Ingalls v. Buckeye Partners, L.P et al
Plaintiff: John Ingalls and Walter E. Ryan, Jr.
Defendant: Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Martin A. White, Franks S. Sowinski, Oliver G. Richard, III, Pieter Bakker, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Larry C. Payne, Barbara M. Baumann, Clark C. Smith, IFM Investors Pty Ltd., Hercules Merger Sub LLC, Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, Frank S. Sowkinski and IFM Global Infrastructure Fund
Case Number: 1:2020cv00960
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORAL ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions: A hearing on the pending Motions to Dismiss (D.I. #65 , D.I. #68 ) is scheduled for April 21, 2021 at 2:00 PM via video conference before Judge Jennifer L. Hall. The parties shall send a joint email to Cailah_Garfinkel@ded.uscourts.gov containing the following information regarding oral argument on or before April 19, 2021: (1) a video conference link with instructions on how to join the conference; (2) a separate audio-only dial-in; and (3) a list of attendees for each party, specifying who will be presenting argument. Any slide presentations or demonstratives that the parties wish to use during the hearing shall be emailed to Cailah_Garfinkel@ded.uscourts.gov no later than 24 hours prior to the hearing. Slide presentations or demonstratives may be presented by the parties on the video conference screen or referred to by the parties at the hearing. Once the dial-in information is received by the Court, members of the public may obtain it by contacting Chambers at Cailah_Garfinkel@ded.uscourts.gov. All participants (including any media and members of the public) are reminded that recording or broadcasting proceedings is STRICTLY PROHIBITED. All participants shall be present on the video conference no later than 10 minutes prior to the start of the hearing. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/4/2021. (ceg)
January 15, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #68 ), by Walter E. Ryan, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Blake) Modified on 1/18/2021 (nms).
November 17, 2020 Filing 80 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Walter E. Ryan, Jr. re #68 MOTION to Dismiss, #65 MOTION to Dismiss. (Bennett, Blake)
November 16, 2020 Filing 79 REPLY BRIEF re #68 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd.. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORAL ORDER: The Motions to Dismiss (D.I. #65 ; D.I. #68 ) are now REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/16/2020. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(nms)
November 16, 2020 Filing 77 REPLY BRIEF re #65 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowkinski, Martin A. White. (Hendershot, Sabrina) Modified on 11/16/2020 (nms).
October 26, 2020 Filing 76 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #68 OTION to Dismiss, and #65 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by John Ingalls.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/2/2020. (Bennett, Blake) Modified on 10/27/2020 (nms).
October 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Colin Ceriello for Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
October 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew Hammond for Hercules Merger Sub LLC, for IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, for IFM Investors Pty Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 19, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Samuel B. Edwards for Walter E. Ryan, Jr. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 19, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ryan S. Cook for Walter E. Ryan, Jr. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #75 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Amending the Schedule Governing Briefing on Motions to Dismiss (Reset Briefing Schedule: re #68 MOTION to Dismiss, and #65 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief due 10/26/2020, Reply Brief due 11/16/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/19/2020. (nms)
October 16, 2020 Filing 75 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Amending the Schedule Governing Briefing on Motions to Dismiss - filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr.. (Bennett, Blake) Modified on 10/19/2020 (nms).
September 28, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Srinivas Mudunuri Raju on behalf of Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd. (Raju, Srinivas)
September 15, 2020 Filing 73 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, Corporate Parent Hercules Investment Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent IFM FLIQ Holdings 2 LLC for Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC filed by Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd.. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 72 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent IFM Holdings Pty Ltd, Corporate Parent Industry Super Holdings Pty Ltd. for IFM Investors Pty Ltd. filed by Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd.. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 71 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent IMF Global Infrastructure (U.S.), L.P., Corporate Parent IFM Global Infrastructure (Australia) Trust, Other Affiliate Conyers Trust Company (Cayman) for IFM Global Infrastructure Fund filed by Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd.. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 70 DECLARATION re #69 Opening Brief in Support, by Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Moyer, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/16/2020 (nms).
September 15, 2020 Filing 69 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #68 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/29/2020. (Moyer, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/16/2020 (nms).
September 15, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moyer, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/16/2020 (nms).
September 15, 2020 Filing 67 DECLARATION re #66 Opening Brief in Support, by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowkinski, Martin A. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H)(Hendershot, Sabrina) Modified on 9/16/2020 (nms).
September 15, 2020 Filing 66 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #65 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowkinski, Martin A. White.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Hendershot, Sabrina) Modified on 9/16/2020 (nms).
September 15, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowkinski, Martin A. White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hendershot, Sabrina) Modified on 9/16/2020 (nms).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Certify Class (D.I. #37 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice as premature. Plaintiff may seek to reinstate the motion to certify or refile a new motion after the motions to dismiss have been addressed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/31/2020. (nms)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SO ORDERED Granting #62 Stipulation and Proposed Order Governing Briefing on Motions to Dismiss and Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/31/2020. (nms)
August 28, 2020 Filing 62 STIPULATION Governing Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re #37 MOTION to Certify Class by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowkinski, Martin A. White. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #61 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Hammond and Colin Ceriello, filed by IFM Investors Pty Ltd., Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/25/2020. (nms)
August 24, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Hammond and Colin Ceriello - filed by Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd.. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler E. Cragg on behalf of Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd. (Cragg, Tyler)
August 24, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Moyer on behalf of Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC, IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, IFM Investors Pty Ltd. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2020 Filing 58 THIRD AMENDED Class Action Complaint against Buckeye Partners, L.P., Clark C. Smith, Peiter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. Lascala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White, IFM Investors Pty Ltd., IFM Global Infrastructure Fund , Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC and Hercules Merger Sub LLC - filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr..(Bennett, Blake) Modified on 8/18/2020 (nms). Modified on 8/18/2020 (nms).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting #56 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file his Third Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/18/2020. (nms)
August 18, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Parties IFM Investors Pty Ltd., IFM Global Infrastructure Fund, Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC and Hercules Merger Sub LLC have been added per D.I. #58 . The docket text for D.I. #58 has also been corrected. (nms)
August 17, 2020 Filing 56 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint - filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Blake) Modified on 8/17/2020 (nms).
August 13, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Clinton A. Krislov for Walter E. Ryan, Jr. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 10, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan S. Cook - filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr.. (Bennett, Blake)
August 10, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel B. Edwards - filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr.. (Bennett, Blake)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan S. Cook, filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr., and #54 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel B. Edwards, filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/10/2020. (nms)
August 7, 2020 Filing 53 Joint Statement Pursuant To D. Del. LR 81.2, by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne. (Hendershot, Sabrina) Modified on 8/10/2020 (nms).
August 7, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary A. Bornstein and Rory A. Leraris - filed by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowkinski, Martin A. White. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance (D.I. #50 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renew. Certifications by counsel need to indicate if the filing fee has been paid, or if it is being submitted with the motion. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2020. (nms)
August 7, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary A. Bornstein and Rory A. Leraris - filed by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Franks S. Sowinski, Martin A. White. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
August 7, 2020 Filing 49 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC for Buckeye Partners, L.P. filed by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Franks S. Sowinski, Martin A. White. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
August 7, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina M. Hendershot on behalf of Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Franks S. Sowinski, Martin A. White (Hendershot, Sabrina)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #52 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary A. Bornstein and Rory A. Leraris, filed by Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Buckeye Partners, L.P., Frank S. Sowkinski, Martin A. White, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Pieter Bakker, Mark C. McKinley, Clark C. Smith, Barbara J. Duganier, Barbara M. Baumann. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2020. (nms)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clinton A. Krislov, filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/27/2020. (nms)
July 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clinton A. Krislov - filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr.. (Bennett, Blake)
July 20, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake A. Bennett on behalf of Walter E. Ryan, Jr. (Bennett, Blake)
July 17, 2020 Filing 45 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/17/2020. (sam)
July 17, 2020 Filing 44 Record of case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number in Other District: 4:19-cv-02645. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Transfer Case to Delaware.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Stay for 90 Days.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Main Document 42 replaced on 7/17/2020) (ledwards, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY in Support of #39 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Proceedings, filed by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White. (Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to #39 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Proceedings, filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit emails with Defendants counsel regarding tax returns and access to Section 751 income calculations)(Krislov, Clinton) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Proceedings by Buckeye Partners, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 38 ADVISORY by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White, filed.(Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Certify Class by Walter E. Ryan, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2020. (Krislov, Clinton) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White, filed.(Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY in Support of #31 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Delaware, filed by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey S. Johnston, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition to #31 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Delaware, filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Curtis Complaint, #2 Exhibit stipulation to transfer mcmanus case, #3 Exhibit stipulation and order to transfer Ingalls case)(Krislov, Clinton) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Gary Bornstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Rory Ann Leraris to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Delaware by Buckeye Partners, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey S. Johnston, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit D-1, #7 Exhibit D-2, #8 Proposed Order)(Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Rory Ann Leraris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pieter Bakker, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2020. (Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Gary A. Bornstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pieter Bakker, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2020. (Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION re: Resolution of Plaintiff John Ingalls' Attorneys' Fees and Expense Request by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White, filed.(Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION re: Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motion to Transfer by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White, filed.(Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Walter E. Ryan, Jr..(Krislov, Clinton) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appoint.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Clinton A. Krislov to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
November 29, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER re: #15 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, filed.(Cook, Ryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Clinton A. Krislov to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Walter E. Ryan, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CodyArnold, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION for Reconsideration of Dismissal #16 . Case REOPENED.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 Corrected PROPOSED ORDER re: #17 MOTION for Reconsideration of #16 Order, filed.(Cook, Ryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION for Reconsideration of #16 Order filed by Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P., Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. LaSala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White. (Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT to #17 MOTION for Reconsideration of #16 Order by Walter E. Ryan, Jr., filed.(Cook, Ryan) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Reconsideration of #16 Order by Walter E. Ryan, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cook, Ryan) Modified on 11/18/2019 (ledwards, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation of Dismissal (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff by Walter E. Ryan, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Cook, Ryan) Modified on 11/18/2019 (ledwards, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order to Dismiss by Buckeye Partners, L.P., filed.(Johnston, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alfred H Bennett for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from New York Southern. Case Number 1:19-cv-06098; received electronically [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A): THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel, and subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: 1. The Defendants agree to accept service without any further process or request for waiver necessary, and reserves every defense or objection other than as to sufficiency of service of process; 2. The Action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). 3. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/18/2019) (anc) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 18, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of Texas. (anc) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by John Ingalls. (Acocelli, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/9/2019. (Kotowski, Linda) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rory Ann Leraris on behalf of Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P, Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. Lasala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White. (Leraris, Rory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Invesco Ltd. for Buckeye Partners, L.P. Document filed by Buckeye Partners, L.P.(Bornstein, Gary) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary A. Bornstein on behalf of Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P, Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. Lasala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White. (Bornstein, Gary) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/2/2019) (jwh) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ad) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
July 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-05741. Document filed by John Ingalls.(Acocelli, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Acocelli, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pieter Bakker, Barbara M. Baumann, Buckeye Partners, L.P, Barbara J. Duganier, Joseph A. Lasala, Jr., Mark C. McKinley, Larry C. Payne, Oliver G. Richard, III, Clark C. Smith, Frank S. Sowinski, Martin A. White. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17167099)Document filed by John Ingalls. (Attachments: #1 Certification Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws)(Acocelli, Richard) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingalls v. Buckeye Partners, L.P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J. Duganier
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. LaSala, Jr.
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark C. McKinley
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin A. White
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franks S. Sowinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver G. Richard, III
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pieter Bakker
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry C. Payne
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara M. Baumann
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark C. Smith
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IFM Investors Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Andrew Hammond
Represented By: Srinivas Mudunuri Raju
Represented By: Colin Ceriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules Merger Sub LLC
Represented By: Andrew Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules Intermediate Holdings LLC
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Srinivas Mudunuri Raju
Represented By: Colin Ceriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank S. Sowkinski
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IFM Global Infrastructure Fund
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Represented By: Andrew Hammond
Represented By: Srinivas Mudunuri Raju
Represented By: Colin Ceriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ingalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter E. Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Clinton A. Krislov
Represented By: Ryan S. Cook
Represented By: Samuel B. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?