Cephalon, Inc. v. Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Cephalon, Inc.
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. and Eugia Pharma Specialities Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00962
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s); see report for numbers. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(fms)
July 31, 2020 CASE CLOSED per #7 . (fms)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Cephalon, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
July 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Cephalon, Inc. filed by Cephalon, Inc.. (mal)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,436,190 B2 ;US 8,609,863 B2 ;US 8,791,270 B2 ;US 8,895,756 B2. (mal)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: see attached. Date of Expiration of Patent: see attached. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: see attached. (mal)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd., Eugia Pharma Specialities Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3070100.) - filed by Cephalon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cephalon, Inc. v. Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugia Pharma Specialities Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?