Sweet Charlie's Franchising, LLC et al v. Sweet Moo's Rolled Ice Cream, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sweet Charlie's Franchising, LLC and Sweet Charlie's Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Peter Aguib, Sweet Moo's Rolled Ice Cream, LLC, Roll Up Tennessee, LLC, Pola Aguib and Simon Gaballa Ghattas
Case Number: 1:2020cv00970
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 25 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/21/2020. (nmg)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:19-cv-04618. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 25, 2020 Copy of Orders #10 , #14 , #21 , & #22 mailed to unrep party Roll Up Tennessee, LLC. and Attorney S. Lefkovitz. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO BANKRUPTCY COURT, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY SWEET MOO'S ROLLED ICE CREAM, LLC (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER IS DENIED. IN VIEW OF THE BANKRUPTCY OF SWEET MOO'S ROLLED ICE CREAM, LLC, THE CASE IS STAYED AS TO THAT DEFENDANT. THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE. THE CLERK SHALL TRANSFER THE RECORD TO THAT DISTRICT AND SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/19/20. 6/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL OR UNREP; E-MAILED.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/19/20. 6/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL OR UNREP; E-MAILED.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING OF BANKRUPTCY AND ASSERTION OF AUTOMATIC STAY, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY SWEET MOO'S ROLLED ICE CREAM, LLC.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO BANKRUPTCY COURT, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY SWEET MOO'S ROLLED ICE CREAM, LLC. (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Transfer filed by SWEET CHARLIE'S FRANCHISING, LLC, SWEET CHARLIE'S HOLDINGS, LLC. (TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 5/14/20, before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber SUZANNE R. WHITE. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE)(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 STATEMENTS OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSING VENUE OF ACTION IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF DELAWARE OR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY PETER AGUIB, POLA AGUIB, SIMON GABALLA GHATTAS. (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON Status Conference held on 5/14/20. Court Reporter: SUZANNE WHITE. (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT ALL DEFENDANTS MUST FILE A RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 4/13/20, WITHIN 14 DAYS; PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND WITHIN 7 DAYS THEREAFTER, WHICH SHALL INCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE RULE 12(B)(3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE, FILED BY DEFENDANTS. THE TWO CORPORATE DEFENDANTS MUST BE REPRESENTED BY COUNSEL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/14/20. 5/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS; E-MAILED.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SWEET CHARLIE'S FRANCHISING, LLC, SWEET CHARLIE'S HOLDINGS, LLC re #10 Order, (TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Transfer : Please be advised that an on-the-record TELEPHONE CONFERENCE re Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue (ECF 8) will be held on Thursday, May 14, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., with the Honorable Michael M. Baylson. Conference call dial-in information is as follows:1.DIAL ADDRESS 703-724-3100 2.YOU WILL BE ASKED TO INPUT THE NUMBER YOU WISH TO DIAL (THIS IS THE CONFERENCE CODE): 2000023#3.INPUT PIN 2020# (YOU WILL THEN BE CONNECTED)This Notice has been amended to reflect a change in the dial-in information, the type of hearing, and also since Chambers was able to reach pro se defendants, Plaintiffs counsel no longer is obligated to serve them with this Notice.(lds, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (ON THE RECORD) SET FOR 5/14/2020 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON.Conference call dial-in information is as follows:1.DIAL ADDRESS 703-724-3100 TO CONNECT FOLLOWED BY # SYMBOL2.INPUT CONFERENCE CODE: 2000023#3.INPUT PIN 2020# (YOU WILL THEN BE CONNECTED)The Court directs Plaintiffs counsel to again attempt to serve this Notice upon pro se defendants, by mail and any other means counsel may have access to in which to contact them (e-mail, fax, etc.). Plaintiffs counsel shall report to Chambers the status of his efforts as soon as contact is successfully made, or if not, no later than 48 hours before the scheduled call.(lds, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL E-MAIL A LETTER TO CHAMBERS WITHIN 10 DAYS, AS TO WHY, IF THE CASE IS TO BE TRANSFERRED, IT SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO THE USDC DELAWARE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/13/20. 4/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SES OR UNREPS; E-MAILED.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Transfer filed by SWEET CHARLIE'S FRANCHISING, LLC, SWEET CHARLIE'S HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2, #4 Exhibit Ex 3, #5 Exhibit Ex 4, #6 Exhibit Ex 5, #7 Exhibit Ex 6, #8 Exhibit Ex 7, #9 Exhibit Ex 8, #10 Exhibit Ex 9, #11 Exhibit Ex 10, #12 Exhibit Ex 11, #13 Exhibit Ex 12, #14 Exhibit Ex 13)(TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 DEFENDNT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER FOR IMPROPER VENUE AND IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY PETER AGUIB, POLA AGUIB, SIMON GABALLA GHATTAS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 ENVELOPE)(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SWEET CHARLIE'S FRANCHISING, LLC, SWEET CHARLIE'S HOLDINGS, LLC re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, upon Pola Aguib c/o Sweet Moo's Rolled Ice Cream (TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SWEET CHARLIE'S FRANCHISING, LLC, SWEET CHARLIE'S HOLDINGS, LLC re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, upon Peter Aguib c/o Roll Up Tennessee, LLC t/a Sweet Charlie's (TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SWEET CHARLIE'S FRANCHISING, LLC, SWEET CHARLIE'S HOLDINGS, LLC re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, upon Roll Up Tennessee, LLC t/a Sweet Charlie's (TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SWEET CHARLIE'S FRANCHISING, LLC, SWEET CHARLIE'S HOLDINGS, LLC re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, upon Simon Gaballa Ghattas c/o Sweet Moo's Rolled Ice Cream, LLC (TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SWEET CHARLIE'S FRANCHISING, LLC, SWEET CHARLIE'S HOLDINGS, LLC re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Upon Sweet Moo's Rolled Ice Cream, LLC (TRACTENBERG, CRAIG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, filed by PLFFS SWEET CHARLIE'S FRANCHISING, LLC, SWEET CHARLIE'S HOLDINGS, LLC.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
October 3, 2019 (5) Summons Issued as to PETER AGUIB, POLA AGUIB, SIMON GABALLA GHATTAS, ROLL UP TENNESSEE, LLC, SWEET MOO'S ROLLED ICE CREAM, LLC. Forwarded To: counsel on 10/7/19. (kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PETER AGUIB, POLA AGUIB, SIMON GABALLA GHATTAS, ROLL UP TENNESSEE, LLC, SWEET MOO'S ROLLED ICE CREAM, LLC ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE#204725.), filed by SWEET CHARLIE'S FRANCHISING, LLC, SWEET CHARLIE'S HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweet Charlie's Franchising, LLC et al v. Sweet Moo's Rolled Ice Cream, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweet Charlie's Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweet Charlie's Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Aguib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Moo's Rolled Ice Cream, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roll Up Tennessee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pola Aguib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Gaballa Ghattas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?