Fletcher v. Mariotti et al
Plaintiff: Richard Fletcher
Defendant: Brian Mariotti, Russell Nickel, Adam Kriger, Diane Irvine, Michael Lunsford, Gino Dellomo, Jennifer Fall Jung, Charles Denson, Ken Brotman and Sarah Kirshbaum Levy
Nominal Defendant: Funko, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01031
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 8 in 20-cv-1031-RGA; D.I. 6 in 20-cv-947-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Appointing Lead and Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/8/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00947-RGA, 1:20-cv-01031-RGA(nms)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Appointing Lead and Liaison Counsel by Richard Fletcher, Nathan Rubin. (deLeeuw, Peter)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. O'Toole on behalf of Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc., Diane Irvine, Jennifer Fall Jung, Adam Kriger, Sarah Kirshbaum Levy, Michael Lunsford, Brian Mariotti, Russell Nickel (O'Toole, John)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER: The stipulated motion (D.I. 5 20-cv-1031-RGA; D.I. 4 in 20-cv-947-RGA is DENIED. The court would approve it if there were only one lead counsel. This is a case each counsel filed on its own, and two co-lead counsel dilutes responsibility for no good reason when either counsel could competently handle the case on its own. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00947-RGA, 1:20-cv-01031-RGA(nms)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Appointing Co-Lead And Liaison Counsel, by Richard Fletcher, Nathan Rubin. (deLeeuw, Peter) Modified on 9/3/2020 (nms).
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond J. DiCamillo on behalf of Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc., Diane Irvine, Jennifer Fall Jung, Adam Kriger, Sarah Kirshbaum Levy, Michael Lunsford, Brian Mariotti, Russell Nickel (DiCamillo, Raymond)
September 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric M. Carrino for Richard Fletcher added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric M. Carrino, filed by Richard Fletcher. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/2/2020. (nms)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric M. Carrino - filed by Richard Fletcher. (deLeeuw, Peter)
August 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
July 31, 2020 No Summons Issued. (mal)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED Stockholder Derivative Complaint against Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc., Diane Irvine, Jennifer Fall Jung, Adam Kriger, Sarah Kirshbaum Levy, Michael Lunsford, Brian Mariotti, Russell Nickel (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3100275) - filed by Richard Fletcher. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) Modified on 8/5/2020 (nms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher v. Mariotti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mariotti
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Nickel
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kriger
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Irvine
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lunsford
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gino Dellomo
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Fall Jung
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Denson
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Brotman
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Kirshbaum Levy
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Fletcher
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Represented By: Eric M. Carrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Funko, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?