In re: SS Body Armor I, Inc., et al
Appellee: The Recovery Trust for SS Body Armor I, Inc., SS Body Armor I, Inc. and Point Blank Solutions, Inc., et al.
Appellant: John Malone, Mohawk Capital, LLC, Jeff Dardarian, Rodney McFadden, Daniel Khaykis, Jon Jacks and Chong Sin
Case Number: 1:2020cv01033
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Telephonic Mediation Conference is set for 12/2/2020 beginning at 10:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/9/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01033-MN, 1:20-cv-01034-MN(cak)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by The Recovery Trust for SS Body Armor I, Inc. //Appellees Recovery Trust and Post-Confirmation Debtor's Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claim No. 402 filed by D. David Cohen, #2 Exhibit Claim No. 434 filed by Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP, #3 Exhibit Claim No. 568 filed by D. David Cohen, #4 Exhibit Opinion of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit)(Gibson, Jason) Modified on 9/1/2020 (dlw).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 8/31/2020 at 10:00 AM Eastern Time with Judge Mary Pat Thynge regarding ADR. Counsel for appellees shall initiate the teleconference call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/19/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01033-MN, 1:20-cv-01034-MN(cak)
August 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01033-UNA, 1:20-cv-01034-UNA(nms)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Monday, August 17, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/3/20. (cak)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (amf)
August 3, 2020 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (amf)
August 3, 2020 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (amf)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 7/21/2020 by Chief Judge Christopher S. Sontchi in Bankruptcy case number 10-11255 CSS. Fee Status Paid.- filed by John Malone, Jon Jacks, Jeff Dardarian, Mohawk Capital, LLC, Rodney McFadden, Daniel Khaykis, and Chong Sin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: SS Body Armor I, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Recovery Trust for SS Body Armor I, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Scott James Leonhardt
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SS Body Armor I, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Represented By: James E. O'Neill, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Point Blank Solutions, Inc., et al.
Represented By: Jason Anthony Gibson
Represented By: Scott James Leonhardt
Represented By: Frederick Brian Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John Malone
Represented By: R. Stephen McNeill
Represented By: Jeremy W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mohawk Capital, LLC
Represented By: R. Stephen McNeill
Represented By: Jeremy W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jeff Dardarian
Represented By: R. Stephen McNeill
Represented By: Jeremy W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rodney McFadden
Represented By: R. Stephen McNeill
Represented By: Jeremy W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Daniel Khaykis
Represented By: R. Stephen McNeill
Represented By: Jeremy W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jon Jacks
Represented By: R. Stephen McNeill
Represented By: Jeremy W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chong Sin
Represented By: R. Stephen McNeill
Represented By: Jeremy W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?