Meredith Corporation v. theMaven, Inc.
Plaintiff: Meredith Corporation
Defendant: theMaven, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01072
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 CASE CLOSED (ntl)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Meredith Corporation (Hendershot, Sabrina)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint to September 24, 2020 filed by theMaven, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/24/20. (ntl)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint to September 24, 2020 - filed by theMaven, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 22, 2020 filed by theMaven, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/16/20. (ntl)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 22, 2020 - filed by theMaven, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 15, 2020 filed by theMaven, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/10/20. (ntl)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 15, 2020 - filed by theMaven, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis)
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meredith Corporation. theMaven, Inc. served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Hendershot, Sabrina)
August 17, 2020 No Summons Issued. (myr)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Meredith Corporation filed by Meredith Corporation. (myr)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against theMaven, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3134176.) - filed by Meredith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meredith Corporation v. theMaven, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Corporation
Represented By: Sabrina M. Hendershot
Represented By: Ryan D. Stottmann
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: theMaven, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?