Phillips v. Saul
Plaintiff: Aliyah Z. Phillips
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01078
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SERVIE AND SCHEDULING: Within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/5/2020. (nms)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/27/2020. (nms)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (IFP Filed. No Filing Fee Paid.)- filed by Aliyah Z. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Aliyah Z. Phillips. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliyah Z. Phillips
Represented By: Angela Pinto Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?