In re: NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC, et al.
Appellant: NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC
Appellee: Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Somera Road, Inc. and Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust
Case Number: 1:2020cv01081
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 CASE CLOSED per Order granting Motion to Remand to the Bankruptcy Court. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting (5 in 1:20-cv-01080-CFC) MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand, granting (5 in 1:20-cv-01082-CFC) MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand, granting (5 in 1:20-cv-01081-CFC) MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust. ORDER Remanding Case to the District of Delaware Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Flash Drive. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Brett D. Fallon on behalf of Somera Road, Inc. (Fallon, Brett)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Appellee, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust regarding Motion to Remand - re #5 MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand. (Ross, Sommer)
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 [SEALED] MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in the form of a flash drive. Filing related to (17 in 1:20-cv-01082-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (17 in 1:20-cv-01081-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (17 in 1:20-cv-01080-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., LNR Partners, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in the form of a flash drive. Filing related to (16 in 1:20-cv-01082-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (16 in 1:20-cv-01081-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (16 in 1:20-cv-01080-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Notice of Sealed Multi-Media Materials Submitted to the Clerk of the Court in Connection with Lender Appellees and Cross-Appellants Record Designations. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Sommer L. Ross on behalf of Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Ross, Sommer)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Notice of Public Multi-Media Materials Submitted to the Clerk of the Court in Connection with Lender Appellees and Cross-Appellants Record Designations. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Sommer L. Ross on behalf of Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Ross, Sommer)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT re #14 Statement of Issues on Appeal, Appellee Somera Road Inc.'s Counter-Designation of Record for Appeal by Somera Road, Inc.. (Fallon, Brett)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF ISSUES on Appeal filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Cross-Appellant's Statement of Issues on Cross-Appeal and Lender Appellees' and Cross-Appellant's Record Designations (Ross, Sommer)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, appellant having filed this cross-appeal (D.1.7) without prepayment of the filing fee, IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, appellant, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, shall pay the $298 filing fee, payable to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware (Office of Clerk, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market Street, Wilmington, DE 19801 ). Appellant's failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this appeal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2020. (nmf)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by NNN 400 Capital Center 16, LLC, NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC in the form of a flash drive. Filing related to (9 in 1:20-cv-01081-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (9 in 1:20-cv-01080-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (9 in 1:20-cv-01082-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials,. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 [SEALED] MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by NNN 400 Capital Center 16, LLC, NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC in the form of a flash drive. Filing related to (8 in 1:20-cv-01080-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (8 in 1:20-cv-01081-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (8 in 1:20-cv-01082-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials,. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal re D.I. #7 Notice of Cross Appeal - filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust. (amf)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Items Designated on Appeal (Public Documents). Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr on behalf of NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC (Francella, Thomas)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Items Designated on Appeal (Sealed Documents). Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr on behalf of NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC (Francella, Thomas)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Cross Appeal by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust (Ross, Sommer)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC and Statement of Issues (Francella, Thomas)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand - filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ross, Sommer)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust. (Ross, Sommer)
August 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC (rjb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Thursday, September 10, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/20/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-UNA, 1:20-cv-01081-UNA, 1:20-cv-01082-UNA(cak)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mal) .
August 19, 2020 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (mal)
August 19, 2020 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (mal)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 8/10/2020 by John T. Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 16-12728 (JTD). Fee Status Paid.- filed by NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #2 Final Judgment on Appeal, #3 Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Joel Kotler
Represented By: Sommer L. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LNR Partners, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Joel Kotler
Represented By: Sommer L. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lawrence Joel Kotler
Represented By: Sommer L. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Taconic Capital Advisors, LP
Represented By: Lawrence Joel Kotler
Represented By: Sommer L. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Somera Road, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Ennis
Represented By: Brett D. Fallon
Represented By: Carl N. Kunz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust
Represented By: Lawrence Joel Kotler
Represented By: Sommer L. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?