ASARCO Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust v. United States of America
Plaintiff: ASARCO Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01088
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Process and complaint served on David C. Weiss, Internal Revenue Service, and U.S. Department of Justice on 8/20/2020, 8/25/2020, 8/26/2020, filed by ASARCO Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hogan, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, Granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: United States of America answer due 12/18/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/15/2020. (nms)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coppler, Catriona) Modified on 10/15/2020 (nms).
August 31, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Clint L. Taylor for ASARCO Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clint L. Taylor, filed by ASARCO Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/27/2020. (nms)
August 26, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 6 has been removed from the docket as it was duplicative of the filing at D.I. #5 . (nms)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clint L. Taylor - filed by ASARCO Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust. (Hogan, Daniel)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by ASARCO Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust. United States of America served on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Hogan, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please print out for use/service). (nmg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against United States of America - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3140170.) - filed by ASARCO Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASARCO Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASARCO Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Represented By: Daniel K. Hogan
Represented By: Garvan F. McDaniel
Represented By: Clint L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Catriona M. Coppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?