In re: Seroquel XR (Extended Release Quetiapine Fumarate) Litigation All End-Payor Class Actions
Plaintiff: Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, WELFARE PLAN OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCALS 137, 137a, 137b and 137R, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R and NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC, Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited and Astrazeneca LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv01090
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 154 Joint STATUS REPORT AND STATEMENT OF PENDING MATTERS WHICH REQUIRE JUDICIAL ATTENTION by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (113 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 71 in 1:20-cv-01201-CFC, 74 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 153 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 35 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 88 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(fms)
October 6, 2020 Filing 153 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of OMELVENY & MYERS LLP - filed by Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: On or before October 8, 2020, the parties shall confer and file a single combined status report regarding the related cases. STATUS REPORT ORDER:( Status Report due by 10/8/2020.) Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
September 22, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Donna M. Evans,Matthew W. Ruan and Archana Tamoshunas for Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #151 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew W. Ruan filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, #152 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Archana Tamoshunas filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, #150 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donna M. Evans filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/22/2020. (fms)
September 21, 2020 Filing 152 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Archana Tamoshunas - filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Barry, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 151 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew W. Ruan - filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Barry, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 150 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donna M. Evans - filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Barry, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jayne A. Goldstein for Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
September 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Heidi M. Silton for Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
September 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jessica N. Servais for Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
September 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sharon K. Robertson for Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
September 18, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Deborah A. Elman for Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 18, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert G. Eisler for Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
September 17, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B. Blumenfeld on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #147 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jayne A. Goldstein filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, #146 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heidi M. Silton filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, #148 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon K. Robertson filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, #145 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica N. Servais filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/11/2020. (nmf)
September 9, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon K. Robertson - filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Barry, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 147 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jayne A. Goldstein - filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund. (Barry, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 146 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heidi M. Silton - filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Barry, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 145 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica N. Servais - filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Barry, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (72 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 33 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 144 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 86 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle filed by Accord Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (85 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 143 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 71 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Lang filed by Accord Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 8, 2020 Filing 144 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina E. Fahmy and Peter M. Boyle - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc.. (Shaw, John)
September 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James E. Gallagher, and Christopher J. Marino for Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
September 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin M. Greenblum, and John E. Schmidtlein for AstraZeneca L.P., for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., and for AstraZeneca UK Limited, added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(sam)
September 4, 2020 Filing 143 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Lang - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc.. (Shaw, John)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Marino & James E. Gallagher filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2020. (fms)
September 3, 2020 Filing 142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Marino & James E. Gallagher - filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Connolly, Arthur)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (69 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 140 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 100 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 30 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 83 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca L P, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC(fms)
September 2, 2020 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Shaw on behalf of Accord Healthcare Inc., Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Shaw, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 140 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor - filed by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and Colette T. Connor)(Silver, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #139 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert G. Eisler filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., #138 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deborah A. Elman filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/2/2020. (fms)
August 31, 2020 Filing 139 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert G. Eisler - filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Barry, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deborah A. Elman - filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Barry, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Ryan Harper on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Harper, Brandon)
August 26, 2020 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Riley on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Riley, Stephanie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Connolly, Arthur)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 1:20-cv-01090-CFC (rjb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Joyce, Alexandra)
August 25, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Kelly, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Silver, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Barry on behalf of Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R (Barry, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 130 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/18/2020. (sam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 129 Record of case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-08296. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
August 12, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Delaware. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER granting (107) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM. Defendants' motion to transfer this action to the District of Delaware is GRANTED. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. It is a "written opinion." The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. No. 107 and transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 127 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Laurel S. Fensterstock dated March 25, 2020 re: Notice of Withdrawal. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Fensterstock, Laurel)[Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney. Document filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Smith, Allison) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of End Payor Class Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority re: #124 Notice (Other),. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc...(Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer.. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #123 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Colleen McMahon for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Hudson, Tyler) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (25) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08712-CM; granting (26) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08856-CM; granting (21) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09036-CM; granting (31) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM; granting (22) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09094-CM; granting (26) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09171-CM; granting (21) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09271-CM. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 121 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Bradshaw, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 120 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer. . Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1)(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Representation. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Levine, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #117 MOTION for Austin P. Brane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-18246572.(Brane, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #115 Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/9/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #115 MOTION for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-18141885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. #117 MOTION for Austin P. Brane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid;.. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 117 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Austin P. Brane to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Brane, Austin) Modified on 12/6/2019 (vba). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-18141885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al.(Evans, Donna) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (23) Motion for Justin N. Boley to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Justin N. Boley is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (19) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08712-CM; granting (20) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08856-CM; granting (15) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09036-CM; granting (17) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM; granting (16) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09094-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (21) Motion for Tyler J. Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Tyler J. Story is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 111 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from John E. Schmidtlein dated November 11, 2019 re: Seroquel XR U.S. Sales in 2011. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited.(Schmidtlein, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen McMahon: Decision: Initial conference with attorneys held. Related cases will adhere to briefing schedule (19-cv-7233, Dkt. No. 66; 19-cv-8296, Dkt. No. 45). The following cases are consolidated as member cases to JM Smith Corp. v. AstraZeneca Pharm. L P et al (19-cv-7233): CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al (19-cv-09999); Walgreen Co. et al (19-cv-10049). The following cases are consolidated as member cases to In re Seroquel XR Litigation End-Payor Action (19-cv-8296): NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund (19-cv-9171); The Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund and The Retired Firefighters Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters Association (19-cv-9271). Submitted by: Nicole A. Palmadesso. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 110 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Counsel for End-Payor Plaintiffs dated November 7, 2019 re: Diversity Jurisdiction. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc..(Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth S Metcalf on behalf of Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund. (Metcalf, Elizabeth) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 108 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Proposed Schedule, #2 Exhibit B-Defendants' Proposed Schedule, #3 Exhibit C-Comparison Of The Parties' Schedules)(Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Declaration of C. Connor, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 106 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #105 Letter substituting Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. as a filing party filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Please refile correctly. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/5/19) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 105 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Benjamin G. Bradshaw dated November 1, 2019 re: substitute Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. as a filing party. Document filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Bradshaw, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix)(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer. Document filed by Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit C. Connor Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (96) Motion for Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (22) Motion for Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kenneth A. Wexler is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #97 Motion for Justin N. Boley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/30/2019) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tyler J. Story on behalf of Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-09083-CM(Story, Tyler) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin N Boley on behalf of Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-09083-CM(Boley, Justin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth A. Wexler on behalf of Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-09083-CM(Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 29, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (97 in 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 23 in 1:19-cv-09083-CM) MOTION for Justin N. Boley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (22 in 1:19-cv-09083-CM, 96 in 1:19-cv-08296-CM) MOTION for Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-09083-CM(bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for Justin N. Boley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-09083-CM(Boley, Justin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-09083-CM(Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #94 Motion for Tyler J. Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Tyler J. Story is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/28/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #93 MOTION for Justin N. Boley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17821528. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT STATE OF ILLINOIS;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #92 MOTION for Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17821400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF ILLINOIS;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #94 MOTION for Tyler J. Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17821712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION for Tyler J. Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17821712. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-09083-CM(Story, Tyler) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 93 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Justin N. Boley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17821528. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-09083-CM(Boley, Justin) Modified on 10/25/2019 (vba). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 92 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17821400. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-09083-CM(Wexler, Kenneth) Modified on 10/25/2019 (vba). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 91 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #90 Letter filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. ENDORSEMENT: I am happy to host Mr. Eisenkraft. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/21/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 90 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Sharon K. Robertson dated October 18, 2019 re: November 8, 2019 Conference. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland.(Robertson, Sharon) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft on behalf of Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Eisenkraft, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #86 Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/17/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties in the above-captioned matters are hereby instructed to appear for a conference on Friday, November 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/17/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #86 MOTION for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17783729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17783729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al.(Khan, Sabira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #65 Motion for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/16/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #74 Motion for Karen H. Riebel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/15/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #77 Motion for Heidi M. Silton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/15/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #72 Motion for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of the Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/11/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #77 MOTION for Heidi M. Silton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17757655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #71 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/11/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heidi M. Silton on behalf of Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Silton, Heidi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #73 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/11/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting #66 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/11/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Heidi M. Silton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17757655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Silton, Heidi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #69 MOTION for Jessica N. Servais to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/11/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #74 MOTION for Karen H. Riebel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17756427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Hanson Riebel on behalf of Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Riebel, Karen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for Karen H. Riebel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17756427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Riebel, Karen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #73 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17751832. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Allison B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17751832. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison B. Smith, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Allison) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #72 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17751559. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17751559. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntyre, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #71 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17751154. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17751154. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradshaw, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #69 MOTION for Jessica N. Servais to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17750076. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica N. Servais on behalf of Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Servais, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Jessica N. Servais to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17750076. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Servais, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #64 Letter,, filed by Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R, Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. ENDORSEMENT: I am appointing No One until we meet. I am aware of the 7th case. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/9/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #43 Motion for Timothy A. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/9/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 9, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #65 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #65 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-17744643.(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 9, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #66 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17744539. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for John E. Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17744539. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Colette T. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Connor, Colette) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Counsel for EPPs dated October 8, 2019 re: End-Payor's Motion for Appointment as Rule 23(g)(3) Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 63 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Document filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 62 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Handa Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Gallagher, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Edward Gallagher on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Gallagher, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 60 ENDORSED MEMO with respect to #52 Motion to Appoint Counsel. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel we need to conference these cases. I have no intent in running up legal bills by appointing 6 lead counsel. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/7/2019) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Christopher John Marino to RE-FILE Document #40 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Williamson, Brett) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Schock on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Schock, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jay Frackman on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Suzanne Wall on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Wall, Carolyn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #55 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 55 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. Related Document Number: #52 . (Eisler, Robert) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Robert G. Eisler in Support re: #52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Unopposed Motion for Appointment as Rule 23(g) Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- GE Firm Biography, #2 Exhibit B-Cohen Milstein Biography, #3 Exhibit C- SFMS Biography)(Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Unopposed Motion for Appointment as Rule 23(g) Interim Class Counsel. . Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Unopposed Motion for Appointment as Rule 23(g) Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Astrazeneca PLC for Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. Document filed by Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited.(Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited. (Greenblum, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurel Sage Fensterstock on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Fensterstock, Laurel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Seebald on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Seebald, Craig) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Alan Levine on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Levine, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137a, 137b and 137R. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Robertson, Sharon) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION ALLOWING FOR CONSOLIDATION AND ENTRY OF AN INTERIM SCHEDULE: 1. All actions related to the End-Payor Class Actions filed in or transferred to this district, or to be filed or transferred, shall bear the following caption: In re: Seroquel XR (Extended Release Quetiapine Fumarate) Litigation All End-Payor Class Actions. 2. Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc., et al v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., et al., 1:19-cv-08296-CM shall be designated the Lead End-Payor Class Action. A lead End-Payor Class Action file will be established for the End-Payor Class Actions and a docket sheet shall be maintained for that file which shall include all filings subsequently coordinated with the lead End-Payor Class Action, as further set forth in this Order. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2019. Motions due by 10/31/2019. Responses due by 11/27/2019. Replies due by 12/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/2/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al.(mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 44 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Robertson, Sharon) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #43 MOTION for Timothy A. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Timothy A. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Newman, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 42 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Timothy A. Newman in Support re: #41 AMENDED MOTION for Timothy A. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Newman, Timothy) Modified on 10/1/2019 (wb). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 41 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION for Timothy A. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newman, Timothy) Modified on 10/1/2019 (wb). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 40 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Marino, Christopher) Modified on 10/7/2019 (ldi). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 24, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #38 MOTION for Timothy A. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17647813. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas. We do not except certificates from state bar associations.; Attorney Affidavit/Declaration missing per local rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 39 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Timothy A. Newman in Support re: #38 MOTION for Timothy A. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17647813. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Newman, Timothy) Modified on 9/24/2019 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 38 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Timothy A. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17647813. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newman, Timothy) Modified on 9/24/2019 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Christopher John Marino to RE-FILE Document #35 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OK. Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 11/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/20/2019) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Thomas J. Lang dated September 20, 2019. Document filed by Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 35 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Marino, Christopher) Modified on 9/23/2019 (ldi). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 34 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Marino, Christopher) Modified on 9/23/2019 (ldi). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Marino on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Marino, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. Service was accepted by Emily King, Vice President. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 30 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. for Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Feldman on behalf of Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Feldman, William) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Lang on behalf of Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lang, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Astrazeneca UK Limited waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Astrazeneca LP waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca UK Limited. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca LP. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Gerard Eisler on behalf of Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Eisler, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc..(Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca UK Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Deborah A. Elman to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the Civil Action No. listed on the PDF contains an error, some of the numbers were inverted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [10;11;12] ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED. The document was issued contained a PDF error. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Deborah A. Elman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) Modified on 9/6/2019 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) Modified on 9/6/2019 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) Modified on 9/6/2019 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) Modified on 9/6/2019 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) Modified on 9/6/2019 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca UK Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Elman, Deborah) Modified on 9/6/2019 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-7233 (CM). Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc..(Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17551149)Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc..(Elman, Deborah) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Seroquel XR (Extended Release Quetiapine Fumarate) Litigation All End-Payor Class Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Marino
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Harper
Represented By: James E. Gallagher
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca UK Limited
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca LP
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund
Represented By: Heidi M. Silton
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Jessica N. Servais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson
Represented By: Matthew W. Ruan
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Archana Tamoshunas
Represented By: Donna M. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund
Represented By: Jayne A. Goldstein
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELFARE PLAN OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCALS 137, 137a, 137b and 137R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler
Represented By: Deborah A. Elman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?