Shannon v. Saul
Plaintiff: Darryl L. Shannon
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01160
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/13/2020. (nmf)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2020. (nmf)
September 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 1, 2020 No Summons Issued. (myr)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul (IFP Filed, NO Fee Paid) - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Darryl L. Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Darryl L. Shannon. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl L. Shannon
Represented By: Angela Pinto Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?