Haley et al v. Frankel et al
Plaintiff: Diana E. Bennett and Shawn R. Haley
Defendant: Office of Code Enforcement for Kent County Delaware, Mr. Robert Frankel and Delaware Justice of the Peace Court Number 7
Case Number: 1:2020cv01199
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/26/2020. (kmd)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiffs shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within thirty days from the date this order is sent, or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/2020. (mal)
September 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Delaware Justice of the Peace Court Number 7, Robert Frankel, Office of Code Enforcement for Kent County Delaware (IFP Filed, No Fee Paid)- filed by Shawn R. Haley, Diana E. Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Diana E. Bennett, Shawn R. Haley. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haley et al v. Frankel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Code Enforcement for Kent County Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Robert Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Justice of the Peace Court Number 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana E. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn R. Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?