Hall v. State Of Delaware
Petitioner: Jonathan S. Hall
Respondent: State Of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2020cv01291
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Jonathan S. Hall. (apk)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Jonathan S. Hall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(apk)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 OPENING BRIEF in Support filed by Jonathan S. Hall.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(apk)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service and Filing of Opening Brief. - filed by Jonathan S. Hall. (apk)
September 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (No fee paid)- filed by Jonathan S. Hall.(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. State Of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan S. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?