Cabana v. State of Delaware Department of Insurance
Plaintiff: Alice R. Cabana
Defendant: State of Delaware Department of Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv01338
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Alice R. Cabana: For State of Delaware Department of Insurance waiver sent on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Poliquin, Ronald)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alice R. Cabana. State of Delaware Department of Insurance served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Poliquin, Ronald)
October 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 2, 2020 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against State of Delaware Department of Insurance - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3240392.) - filed by Alice R. Cabana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabana v. State of Delaware Department of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Delaware Department of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice R. Cabana
Represented By: Ronald George Poliquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?