Ohmer v. Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Ohmer
Defendant: CBS Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Grinnell LLC, AlliedSignal, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., DAP, Inc. N-K-A Mirada Product, Inc., FMC Corporation, ViaCom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., A Pennsylvania Corp., Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, Pneumo Abex LLC, The Bendix Corporation, ITT Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Grinnell Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc. and Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01356
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 1/6/2021 at 12:00 p.m. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 12/30/2020. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/13/2020. (lih)
November 11, 2020 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by FMC Corporation. (Glenn, Neal)
November 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Reese on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Reese, C.)
November 11, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean R. Roland on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Roland, Dean)
November 11, 2020 Filing 19 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec, Esq. regarding Service of the Complaint, Defendants' Answers, and R.16 Conference. (Hrubiec, R.)
November 5, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 11/5/2020 (lih).
October 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Costello, Kelly)
October 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of ITT Corporation (Costello, Kelly)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/28/2020. (lih)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation. (Glenn, Neal)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Donelson, Matthew)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Costello, Kelly)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Glenn on behalf of FMC Corporation (Glenn, Neal)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
October 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
October 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Honeywell International, Inc. filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Enstar Holdings (US) LLC for Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC filed by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC. (Seelaus, Anne)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Kai Seelaus on behalf of Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Seelaus, Anne)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation filed by CBS Corporation. (sam)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct., Case Number N20C-07-246 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3250115)- filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohmer v. Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedSignal, Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, Inc. N-K-A Mirada Product, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViaCom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., A Pennsylvania Corp.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Anne Kai Seelaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: C. Scott Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Ohmer
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?