Roadarmel v. Curtiss-Wright Corporation
Plaintiff: Patricia Roadarmel
Defendant: Curtiss-Wright Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01375
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon from David W. deBruin regarding Response to Oral Order to Show Cause. (deBruin, David) Modified on 12/4/2020 (lih).
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel D. Elswick, Esquire - filed by Patricia Roadarmel. (Attachments: #1 Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(deBruin, David)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel D. Elswick. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/4/2020. (lih)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Curtiss-Wright Corporation.(Tome, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2020 (lih).
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Tome on behalf of Curtiss-Wright Corporation (Tome, Brian)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Whereas, in response to the courts October 30, 2020 order (D.I. #3 ), Plaintiffs counsel filed a letter with the court on November 12, 2020, stating that Defendant Curtiss-Wright had been served with the complaint but had not answered, objected, or otherwise pleaded in this case (D.I. #4 ); Whereas, the letter further suggested that it may be prudent to delay scheduling a Rule 16 scheduling conference until Defendant Curtiss-Wright answers, objects, or otherwise defends the case (Id.); and Whereas, to date, Defendant Curtiss-Wright has not answered, objected, or otherwise pleaded in this case; NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, on or before December 4, 2020, Plaintiff shall (1) confirm proper service of process of the complaint on Defendant Curtiss-Wright, (2) if service has been properly effected, notify the court whether Plaintiff intends to move for a default in appearance, and (3) provide the court with any other information as to why this case has not progressed. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on November 20, 2020. (lih)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 1/6/2021 at 4:30 p.m. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 12/30/2020. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/20/2020. (lih)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 Order. (deBruin, David) Modified on 11/12/2020 (lih).
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/30/2020. (lih)
October 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Delaware Superior Court for NCC, Case Number N20C-04-241 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3256502)- filed by Curtiss-Wright Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roadarmel v. Curtiss-Wright Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtiss-Wright Corporation
Represented By: Brian Tome
Represented By: Walter John O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Roadarmel
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?