Young v. Jennings
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Kathy Jennings
Case Number: 1:2020cv01383
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is denied. (D.I. #8 ) Plaintiff is given twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to comply with the October 26, 2020 Order. (See D.I. #6 ) Failure to timely comply with the order shall result in dismissal of the case without prejudice and the case will be closed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/8/2020. (amf)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/8/2020. (amf)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration Dismissal of re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Order (Pro-Se Non-Prisoner IFP-Deficiency), to Narrow IFP Issues Ahead of a Potential Appeal - filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3).(Note: Copy of the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint was placed in the case file.)(mal)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kathy Jennings- filed by Huguette Nicole Young.(apk)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Plaintiff shall, within twenty-one days from the date of this order either fully complete responses AO Form 239, Application to Proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/26/2020. (nmg)
October 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
October 14, 2020 Remark:Per Duty Judge, case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (myr)
October 14, 2020 Remark: Exit Copies to Duty Judge LPS (myr)
October 13, 2020 Remark: Summons and 285 form received and sent to the case file (myr)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for speedy hearing - filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (myr)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for e-filing rights - filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (myr)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed Pro Se against Kathy Jennings (No Fee Paid, IFP Provided - filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?