Trimarco v. Farley et al
Plaintiff: Michael C. Trimarco
Defendant: Shawn Patrick Carden, Ashish Kapoor, Michael A. Hilmer, Chris Cicolini and Michael T. Farley
Case Number: 1:2020cv01408
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (D.I. 109 ) is ADOPTED. Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #94 ) is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. The Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendant Farleys Motions to Dismiss (D.I. #101 , #102 ) are GRANTED-IN-PART as to the request for dismissal with prejudice, and otherwise DENIED. Defendant Farleys Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. #103 ) is DISMISSED as moot. The motion to adopt (D.I. #110 ) is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/2021. (nms)
November 5, 2021 Filing 110 MOTION to Adopt Report and Recommendation - filed by Michael T. Farley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Motions referred to Judge Jennifer L. Hall.(apk)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons stated in open Court today: (1) Plaintiff Trimarco's Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #94 ) should be GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. Trimarco's request to dismiss should be granted, but his request to dismiss without prejudice should be denied. (2) Defendant Farley's Motions to Dismiss (D.I. #101 , #102 ) should be GRANTED-IN-PART insofar as they request dismissal with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 and 41(b), and should be otherwise DENIED. (3) Defendant Farley's Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. #103 ) should be DENIED as moot. Any objections to the Court's Report and Recommendation shall be filed within fourteen days from today. The parties are directed to the Court's "Standing Order for Objections Filed Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72," dated October 9, 2013, a copy of which can be found on the Court's website. Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2021. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 10/15/2021. (ceg)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated in open Court today, Defendant Farley's Motion for Reconsideration (D.I. #97 ) is DENIED, and Plaintiff Trimarco's Motion to Continue Hearing (D.I. #106 ) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 10/15/2021. (ceg)
October 15, 2021 Filing 107 Letter to Judge Jennifer L. Hall, from Harry R. Haury, regarding Plaintiff's change of address. (myr) Modified on 10/15/2021 (nms).
October 15, 2021 Filing 106 MOTION to Continue Hearing in re D.I. 105 Oral Order - filed by Michael C. Trimarco. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Cover Letter)Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(myr)
October 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Hall - Motion Hearing held on 10/15/2021 re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (D.I. 94), Motion for for Reconsideration (D.I. 97), Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Provide Discovery (D.I. 101), Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Pay Sanctions (D.I. 102), Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. 103), and Motion to Continue Hearing (D.I. 106). Pro Se Plaintiff Michael Trimarco did not appear. (*Court Reporter Stacy Vickers.) (ceg)
October 15, 2021 Remark: Copies of the Oral Order (D.I. 108) and Report and Recommendation (D.I. 109) mailed to all parties. (ceg)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORAL ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions: A hearing on the pending Motion for for Reconsideration (D.I. #97 ), Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Provide Discovery (D.I. #101 ), Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Pay Sanctions (D.I. #102 ), and Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. #103 ) is scheduled for October 15, 2021 at 1:00 P.M. in Courtroom 2B before Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Failure by Plaintiff to appear in person and prove his compliance with the Court's prior order requiring payment of $200 to Defendant Farley will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice, in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 37, 41(a)(2),(b), and/or Poulis v. State Farm Fire & Cas. Co., 747 F.2d 863, 868 (3d Cir. 1984). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 9/23/2021. (ceg)
September 23, 2021 Remark: Copy of the Oral Order Setting Hearing on Motions (D.I. 105) mailed to all parties. (ceg)
August 16, 2021 Filing 104 Letter to Honorable Judge Hall, from Michael T. Farley, regarding pending motions. (mal) Modified on 8/17/2021 (nms).
August 3, 2021 Filing 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Michael T. Farley. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(srs)
July 22, 2021 Filing 102 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Pay Sanctions - filed by Michael T. Farley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(srs) Modified on 7/22/2021 (ceg).
July 22, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Provide Discovery - filed by Michael T. Farley. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(srs) Modified on 7/22/2021 (ceg).
July 20, 2021 Filing 100 OBJECTION to Proposed Voluntary Dismissal (D.I. #94 ), by Chris Cicolini. (apk) Modified on 7/20/2021 (nms).
July 20, 2021 Filing 99 OBJECTION to Proposed Voluntary Dismissal (D.I. #94 ), by Michael T. Farley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(apk) Modified on 7/20/2021 (nms).
July 14, 2021 Filing 97 MOTION for Reconsideration - filed by Michael T. Farley. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(srs) Modified on 7/14/2021 (nms).
July 12, 2021 Filing 98 Defendant Farley's REQUEST for Admissions directed to Plaintiff - filed by Michael T. Farley.(ceg)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed "Plaintiff's Voluntary Case Dismissal Under Rule 41" (D.I. #94 ), the Court construes it as a motion for dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Because this case will be dismissed--either with prejudice or without prejudice, and on terms that the Court considers proper--the Court does not believe that engaging in further discovery is an efficient use of the Court's or the parties' time or resources. Accordingly, the Court orders that the deposition of Plaintiff currently noticed for Monday, July 12, 2021 shall be continued. Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's motion (D.I. #94 ) shall set forth Defendants' positions regarding the terms under which this action should be dismissed. The parties are reminded (again) that all communication from pro se parties to Judge Hall shall be sent in paper form to the Clerk's Office. (See D.I. 70 .). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 7/9/2021. (ceg) Modified on 7/9/2021 - ***Copy emailed to all parties*** (ceg).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORAL ORDER: The case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall for all purposes through the case dispositive motion deadline. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/9/2021. (nms)
July 9, 2021 Filing 94 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Under Rule 41 - filed by Michael C. Trimarco. (kmd)
July 2, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE of Deposition Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.30 by Michael T. Farley (apk)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORAL ORDER: The transcript of the teleconference shall serve as the Court's ruling on the motions. (D.I. #72 ; D.I. #76 ; D.I. #86 ; D.I. #87 .) Plaintiff must respond to all outstanding discovery requests no later than July 19, 2021. Plaintiff must appear for his deposition no later than July 19, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 7/2/2021. ***Copy mailed to all parties***(ceg)
July 2, 2021 Filing 91 Letter from Christopher Byrne, Esq. to Michael Trimarco dated July 2, 2021 submitted directly to the Court by Michael Trimarco. (ceg)
July 2, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Hall - Discovery Teleconference held on 7/2/2021. All parties present. (*Court Reporter Stacy Vickers.) (ceg)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Setting Teleconference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for July 2, 2021 at 10:00 AM on all pending motions, including Plaintiff's motion for stay and Defendants' discovery motions. (D.I. #72 ; D.I. #76 ; D.I. #86 ; D.I. #87 .) All parties to the action must be present at the teleconference and shall call the Court's conference line five minutes prior to the scheduled start time at (877) 336-1829, access code: 7090640. Failure by Plaintiff to attend the July 2, 2021 teleconference will result in dismissal of this action in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37 and Poulis v. State Farm Fire & Cas. Co., 747 F.2d 863, 868 (3d Cir. 1984). (See Order for details) ***Copy mailed to all parties and emailed to Plaintiff 6/25/2021***. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 6/25/2021. (ceg)
June 25, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Hall - Discovery Teleconference held on 6/25/2021. Pro Se Plaintiff Michael Trimarco did not appear. (*Court Reporter Deanna Warner.) (ceg)
June 24, 2021 Filing 88 Letter to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall, dated 06/24/2021, from Michael T. Farley, in response to Motion for Extension of Case Deadlines (D.I. #86 ). (mal) Modified on 6/25/2021 (nms).
June 23, 2021 Filing 90 Letter to Judge Hall, from Michael C. Trimarco, responding to defendant's letter (D.I. #85 ). (apk) Modified on 6/25/2021 (nms).
June 17, 2021 Filing 87 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories and Response to D.I. #81 Second Request for Production of Documents. - filed by Chris Cicolini. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(apk)
June 15, 2021 Filing 86 MOTION for Extension of Case Deadlines, filed by Michael C. Trimarco. (kmd) Modified on 6/16/2021 (nms).
June 14, 2021 Filing 85 Letter to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall, dated 6/14/2021, from Michael T. Farley, regarding discovery. (smg) Modified on 6/15/2021 (nms).
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: The Court has reviewed the pending Motion to Compel Deposition Attendance (D.I. #72 ) and the pending Motion for Teleconference to Resolve a Discovery Dispute (D.I. #76 ). A teleconference on the pending motions is scheduled for June 25, 2021 at 10:00 AM. All parties to the action must be present at the teleconference and shall call the Court's conference line at (877) 336-1829, access code: 7090640. By no later than June 11, 2021, Plaintiff shall file with the Court a letter not to exceed three pages, in no less than 12-point font, showing cause as to why he has not yet been able to complete the discovery requested by Defendant Farley or respond to the pending motions. Failure by Plaintiff to respond or appear may result in sanctions under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(b)(2), including dismissal of this action. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/27/2021. (ceg) Modified on 5/27/2021 - ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Parties 5/27/2021***(ceg).
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the pending Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Ryan M. Ernst of the law firm Bielli & Klauder, LLC (D.I. #75 ) and Plaintiff Michael C. Trimarco's letter indicating that he wishes to proceed without Mr. Ernst's involvement (D.I. #79 ), the unopposed Motion to Withdraw shall be GRANTED. Mr. Ernst shall send a copy of this order to Plaintiff via one-day overnight courier and email. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/27/2021. (ceg)
May 20, 2021 Filing 82 SECOND Interrogatories Propounded to Michael C. Trimarco, filed by Michael T. Farley.(apk) Modified on 5/20/2021 (nms).
May 20, 2021 Filing 81 SECOND Request for Production of Documents, filed by Michael T. Farley.(apk) Modified on 5/20/2021 (nms).
May 14, 2021 Filing 80 Letter to Judge Jennifer L. Hall, from Michael T. Farley, regarding update for availability of teleconference. (apk) Modified on 5/17/2021 (nms).
May 13, 2021 Filing 79 RESPONSE to #75 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel to Plaintiff, filed by Michael C. Trimarco. (sam) Modified
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel to Plaintiff (D.I. #75 ) is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/12/2021. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(nms)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Disqualify Counsel (D.I. #17 ) is DISMISSED as moot. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/12/2021. (nms)
May 7, 2021 Filing 76 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. - filed by Michael T. Farley.(apk)
May 6, 2021 Filing 75 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel to Plaintiff - filed by Michael C. Trimarco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ernst, Ryan) Modified on 5/6/2021 (nms).
May 6, 2021 Filing 74 Joint Notice of Assent, by Chris Cicolini, Michael T. Farley (myr) Modified on 5/6/2021 (nms).
May 6, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record by Michael C. Trimarco (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ernst, Ryan)
May 5, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION to Compel Deposition Attendance - filed by Michael T. Farley. (apk)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Defendant Farley's Motion to Compel (D.I. #38 ) and the associated briefing (D.I. #42 ; D.I. #43 ), it is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion is DENIED. Defendant's requests to compel Plaintiff to respond to certain discovery requests and to compel Plaintiff to appear for a deposition on May 4, 2021 appear to be resolved based upon Plaintiff's representations that his responses would be served by April 30, 2021 and that he will appear for deposition on May 4. Regardless, the Court finds that Plaintiff proffered good cause for a reasonable extension given the volume of discovery propounded and Plaintiff's extenuating family circumstances. To the extent Defendant is seeking an additional order compelling Plaintiff to provide complete responses to that discovery, such a request is premature. For any future discovery disputes, a Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute should be filed. The suggested text for this motion can be found in Judge Hall's portion of the Court's website, in the "Forms" tab, under the heading "Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery/Protective Order Disputes." The dispute will thereafter be addressed in accordance with Judge Hall's discovery dispute procedures. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/4/2021. (ceg) Modified on 5/5/2021 - ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Defendants 5/5/2021***(ceg).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all communication from pro se parties to Judge Hall shall be sent in paper form to the Clerk's Office. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/4/2021. (ceg) Modified on 5/4/2021 - ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Defendants 5/4/2021*** (ceg).
April 28, 2021 Filing 69 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Priority Payments (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 68 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to GoDaddy (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 67 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Microsoft (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 66 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Rackspace (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 65 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Registered Agents, Inc. (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 64 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Mazars Group (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 63 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to ADP (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 62 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to PIB Brokerage (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 61 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Deluca Planning and Brokerage (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 60 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Apay (Al Mucci) (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 59 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to American Express (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 58 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Chase Bank (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 57 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to TD Bank (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 56 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Melrose Ventures, LLC (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 55 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Intelligent Payment Procesing, Inc. (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 54 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Lee Zeldin (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 53 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Robert Beltrani (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 52 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Vincent Tabone (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 51 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Vincent Trimarco (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 50 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Rachel Trimarco (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 49 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Mickey Cavuoti (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 48 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Peter Vogel (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 47 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Kevin Marcus (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 46 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Harry Haury (myr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 45 SUBPOENA filed by Michael T. Farley directed to Eugene Beigelman (myr)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall to handle any and all discovery disputes that arise. Discovery due by 8/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/30/2021 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/28/2021. *Motion(s): D.I. 38 referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(nms) (Main Document 44 replaced on 4/28/2021) (nms).
April 28, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The document at D.I. 44 has been replaced with the correct version. (nms)
April 27, 2021 Filing 43 REPLY BRIEF re #38 MOTION to Compel - filed by Michael T. Farley. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(sam)
April 27, 2021 Filing 42 RESPONSE to #38 MOTION to Compel, filed by Michael C. Trimarco. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Klauder, David) Modified on 4/27/2021 (nms).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Defendant Shawn Patrick Carden is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/15/2021. (nms)
April 14, 2021 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT by Michael C. Trimarco. (Klauder, David)
April 12, 2021 Filing 39 RE-NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Trimarco on May 4, 2021, filed by Michael T. Farley. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(sam) Modified on 4/13/2021 (nms).
April 12, 2021 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #38 MOTION to Compel. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/26/2021. (nms)
April 12, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, Response to Request for Production of Documents and Deposition Attendance, filed by Michael T. Farley. (kmd)
April 12, 2021 Filing 37 RE-NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Trimarco on May 4, 2021, filed by Michael T. Farley.(kmd)
April 12, 2021 Filing 36 REQUEST for Production of Documents directed to Plaintiff, filed by Michael T. Farley.(kmd)
April 12, 2021 Filing 35 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Plaintiff, filed by Michael T. Farley.(kmd)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORAL ORDER: A status letter is due no later than three (3) from the date of this Order regarding service on Defendant Carden (see D.I. 23 ). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/8/2021. (nms)
March 23, 2021 Filing 33 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Proposed Discovery Plan, filed by Michael C. Trimarco. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ernst, Ryan) Modified on 3/24/2021 (nms).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven S. Biss, filed by Michael C. Trimarco. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2021. (nms)
March 17, 2021 Filing 32 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, filed by Chris Cicolini and Michael T. Farley. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(apk) Modified on 3/17/2021 (nms).
March 15, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven S. Biss, filed by Michael C. Trimarco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Ernst, Ryan) Modified on 3/16/2021 (nms).
March 15, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address by Michael C. Trimarco (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ernst, Ryan)
March 15, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY Brief re #17 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel, filed by Michael T. Farley. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(kmd) Modified on 3/15/2021 (nms).
March 10, 2021 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel, filed by Michael C. Trimarco.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ernst, Ryan) Modified on 3/11/2021 (nms).
March 8, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice, filed by Michael T. Farley. (sam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2021: #1 Letter) (sam). Modified on 3/9/2021 (sam). Modified on 3/9/2021 (nms).
March 5, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Letter requesting additional time to effect service (D.I. #22 ), filed by Michael T. Farley. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(kmd) Modified on 3/8/2021 (nms).
March 2, 2021 Filing 25 Certificate of Service for Summons Returned Unexecuted (D.I. #21 ), by Michael C. Trimarco. (Ernst, Ryan) (Main Document 25 replaced on 3/2/2021) (nms). Modified on 3/2/2021 (nms).
March 2, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, filed by Michael T. Farley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Cover Letter)(myr) Modified on 3/2/2021 (nms).
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORAL ORDER: The request for an additional thirty days to effect service on Defendant Carden (D.I. #22 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/2/2021. (nms)
March 2, 2021 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to Plaintiff Michael C. Trimarco re #21 Summons Returned Unexecuted. The filing at D.I. #21 lacks compliance with Local Rule 5.2(b)(1). Counsel for plaintiff is directed to supplement the docket with an appropriate certificate of service that includes a case caption. (nms)
March 2, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf and docket text for D.I. #25 have been corrected to reflect the filing is a certificate of service. The unexecuted summons initially filed has been removed as it is already on file at D.I. #21 . (nms)
March 1, 2021 Filing 22 Status Letter, by Michael C. Trimarco. (Ernst, Ryan) Modified on 3/2/2021 (nms).
March 1, 2021 Filing 21 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael C. Trimarco as to Shawn Patrick Carden. (Ernst, Ryan)
February 25, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael C. Trimarco (Klauder, David)
February 25, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven S. Biss - filed by Michael C. Trimarco. (Ernst, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2021: #1 Certificate of Service) (nms).
February 25, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 19 has been removed from the docket. The certificate of service filed at that entry has been added to the filing at D.I. #18 , as the certificate of service lacked a case caption. (nms)
February 25, 2021 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to Plaintiff Michael C. Trimarco re #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The filing at D.I. #18 lacks compliance with Local Rule 5.2(b)(1). Counsel for plaintiff is directed to supplement the docket with an appropriate certificate of service. (nms)
February 24, 2021 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #17 MOTION to Disqualify Steven Bliss. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/10/2021. (nms)
February 24, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Disqualify Steven Biss, filed by Michael T. Farley. (kmd)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORAL ORDER: Whereas more than 90 days have elapsed since the Complaint was filed, and summons have not been requested or issued as to defendants Shawn Patrick Carden, Michael A. Hilmer or Ashish Kapoor. Plaintiff is now directed to file a status letter within 3 days of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/24/2021. (nms)
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deposition, filed by Michael T. Farley.(mal)
February 23, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST for Production of Documents directed to Plaintiff, filed by Michael T. Farley.(mal)
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Michael C. Trimarco, filed by Michael T. Farley.(mal)
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 filed by Michael T. Farley.(mal)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michael T. Farley. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(mal)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, filed by Chris Cicolini (Attachments: #1 Letter)(apk) Modified on 2/14/2021 (nms).
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for Production of Documents directed to Plaintiff, filed by Chris Cicolini. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(apk) Modified on 2/14/2021 (nms).
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deposition, filed by Chris Cicolini.(nmg)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 filed by Chris Cicolini.(nmg)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Michael C. Trimarco, filed by Chris Cicolini. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(nmg) Modified on 2/24/2021 (nms).
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Chris Cicolini.(sam)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael C. Trimarco. Chris Cicolini served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Ernst, Ryan)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael C. Trimarco: For Michael T. Farley waiver sent on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (Ernst, Ryan)
January 6, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The executed summons filed at D.I. 4 has been removed from the docket as it was filed using the incorrect code. Counsel shall refile this document using the "Summons Returned Executed" code thereby allowing an answer due date to be set. (nms)
October 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Shawn Patrick Carden, Chris Cicolini, Michael T. Farley, Michael A. Hilmer, Ashish Kapoor - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3277902.) - filed by Michael C. Trimarco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
October 20, 2020 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trimarco v. Farley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Patrick Carden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashish Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Hilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Cicolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Trimarco
Represented By: Ryan M. Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?