Jason v. Dexsta Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Daniel Jason
Defendant: Dexsta Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2020cv01416
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #4 . (fms)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dexsta Federal Credit Union. (Kinkus, Jennifer)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to December 1, 2020 filed by Dexsta Federal Credit Union, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Dexsta Federal Credit Union answer due 12/1/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/28/2020. (nmf)
October 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to December 1, 2020 - filed by Dexsta Federal Credit Union. (Kinkus, Jennifer)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Case Number N20C-09-091 MAA (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3283806)- filed by Dexsta Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason v. Dexsta Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexsta Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Kinkus
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jason
Represented By: Adam F. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?