Philpot v. Penske Media Corporation
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Penske Media Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01421
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s): VAu 1-164-648 mailed to Register of Copyrights with copy of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (fms)
November 9, 2020 CASE CLOSED per D.I. 7. (fms)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Larry G. Philpot as to Penske Media Corporation (Warner, Raeann)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Larry G. Philpot. Penske Media Corporation served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Warner, Raeann)
October 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Larry G. Philpot. (sam)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number VAu 1-164-648. Report mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sam)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Penske Media Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3286188.) - filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Penske Media Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Media Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?