Stormborn Technologies LLC v. HID Global Corporation
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: HID Global Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01451
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 11 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(mdb)
December 17, 2020 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #10 . (dlw)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stormborn Technologies LLC as to HID Global Corporation (Chong, Jimmy)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 18, 2021 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: HID Global Corporation answer due 1/18/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/15/2020. (dlw)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 18, 2021 - filed by HID Global Corporation. (Anderson, Jeremy)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, orotherwise respond to the Complaint to December 18, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: HID Global Corporation answer due 12/18/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/16/2020. (dlw)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to December 18, 2020 - filed by HID Global Corporation. (Anderson, Jeremy)
November 6, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Stormborn Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/5/2020. (dlw)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
November 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. HID Global Corporation served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020. (Chong, Jimmy)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (mal)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. RE44,199 E. (mal)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT - filed with Jury Demand against HID Global Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3294016.) - filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Related Cases)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. HID Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HID Global Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Douglas Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?