Viking Technologies, LLC v. FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Plaintiff: Viking Technologies, LLC
Defendant: FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01511
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eimeric Reig-Plessis for FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathi Vidal and Eimeric Reig-Plessis filed by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/11/2020. (fms)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathi Vidal and Eimeric Reig-Plessis - filed by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Poff, Adam)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Wyatt Poff on behalf of FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. (Poff, Adam)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 19, 2021 filed by Viking Technologies, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. answer due 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/1/2020. (fms)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 19, 2021 - filed by Viking Technologies, LLC. (Golden, Ronald)
November 13, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark S. Raskin for Viking Technologies, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01508-CFC, 1:20-cv-01509-CFC, 1:20-cv-01510-CFC, 1:20-cv-01511-CFC(mal)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Viking Technologies, LLC. FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Brauerman, Stephen)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (5 in 1:20-cv-01509-CFC, 5 in 1:20-cv-01508-CFC, 5 in 1:20-cv-01510-CFC, 5 in 1:20-cv-01511-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark S. Raskin, Robert A. Whitman, Michael DeVincenzo, Andrea Pacelli, Charles Wizenfeld, Eric Berger, John Petrsoric and Elizabeth Long filed by Viking Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/12/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01508-CFC, 1:20-cv-01509-CFC, 1:20-cv-01510-CFC, 1:20-cv-01511-CFC(nmf)
November 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01508-CFC, 1:20-cv-01509-CFC, 1:20-cv-01510-CFC, 1:20-cv-01511-CFC (rjb)
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark S. Raskin, Robert A. Whitman, Michael DeVincenzo, Andrea Pacelli, Charles Wizenfeld, Eric Berger, John Petrsoric and Elizabeth Long - filed by Viking Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Certificate of Compliance, #4 Certificate of Compliance, #5 Certificate of Compliance, #6 Certificate of Compliance, #7 Certificate of Compliance, #8 Certificate of Compliance)(Brauerman, Stephen)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Viking Technologies, LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
November 10, 2020 No Summons Issued. (sam)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,888,953 ;10,220,537. (sam)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT- filed with Jury Demand against FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3319952.) - filed by Viking Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viking Technologies, LLC v. FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viking Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Ronald P. Golden, III
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Mark S. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Eimeric Reig-Plessis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?