UniBank for Savings v. 101 Greenspring 2, LLC et al
Plaintiff: UniBank for Savings
Defendant: 101 Greenspring 2, LLC, Danielle M. Sipala and James Sipala
Case Number: 1:2020cv01538
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SO ORDERED Granting #11 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/4/2021. (nms)
December 31, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, by UniBank for Savings. (Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 1/4/2021 (nms).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: 101 Greenspring 2, LLC answer due 1/2/2021; Danielle M. Sipala answer due 1/2/2021; James Sipala answer due 1/2/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/15/2020. (nms)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Jason J. Rawnsley, regarding stipulation to extend deadline to move, answer or otherwise respond to complaint. (Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 12/15/2020 (nms).
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint - filed by UniBank for Savings. (Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 12/15/2020 (nms).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL ORDER: Answers were due to be filed on 12/9/2020 (see D.I. #4 , #5 , and #6 ), and to date none have been filed. The parties are to file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/10/2020. (nms)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Jay Houseal and William E. Gamgort on behalf of All Defendants. (Houseal, Timothy) Modified on 11/23/2020 (nms).
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UniBank for Savings. James Sipala served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Cragg, Tyler)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UniBank for Savings. Danielle M. Sipala served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Cragg, Tyler)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UniBank for Savings. 101 Greenspring 2, LLC served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Cragg, Tyler)
November 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against 101 Greenspring 2, LLC, Danielle M. Sipala, James Sipala - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3334301.) - filed by UniBank for Savings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UniBank for Savings v. 101 Greenspring 2, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UniBank for Savings
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 101 Greenspring 2, LLC
Represented By: William Edward Gamgort
Represented By: Timothy Jay Houseal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle M. Sipala
Represented By: William Edward Gamgort
Represented By: Timothy Jay Houseal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sipala
Represented By: William Edward Gamgort
Represented By: Timothy Jay Houseal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?