Tunnel IP LLC v. Furrion, LLC
Plaintiff: Tunnel IP LLC
Defendant: Furrion, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01615
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Tunnel IP LLC, Case stayed. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/20/2021. (fms)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement - filed by Tunnel IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to January 21, 2021 filed by Furrion, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Furrion, LLC answer due 1/21/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/18/2020. (fms)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to January 21, 2021 - filed by Furrion, LLC. (Mabey, Warren)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tunnel IP LLC. Furrion, LLC served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Chong, Jimmy)
December 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Tunnel IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by Tunnel IP LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/2/2020. (nmf)
December 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by Tunnel IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Tunnel IP LLC. (sam)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,916,877. (sam)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against Furrion, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3356137.) - filed by Tunnel IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tunnel IP LLC v. Furrion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tunnel IP LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furrion, LLC
Represented By: Warren K. Mabey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?