Polk 33 Lending, LLC. v. Schwartz
Plaintiff: Polk 33 Lending, LLC.
Defendant: Mark J. Schwartz
Case Number: 1:2020cv01647
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to February 8, 2021 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Mark J. Schwartz answer due 2/8/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/4/2021. (dlw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Choa on behalf of Mark J. Schwartz (Choa, Jonathan)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, Move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to February 8, 2021 - filed by Mark J. Schwartz. (Shannon, Kevin)
December 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David J. Stone for Polk 33 Lending, LLC. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Stone filed by Polk 33 Lending, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/14/2020. (dlw)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Stone - filed by Polk 33 Lending, LLC.. (deLeeuw, Peter)
December 14, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Mark J. Schwartz on 12/14/2020. (cna, )
December 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 3, 2020 No Summons Issued. (apk)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Mark J. Schwartz - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3373717.) - filed by Polk 33 Lending, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk 33 Lending, LLC. v. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Schwartz
Represented By: Kevin R. Shannon
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polk 33 Lending, LLC.
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Represented By: David J. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?