Truist Bank v. Nanticoke Health Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Truist Bank and Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: Samuel K. Miller, Tarek M. Waked Hammoud, Nanticoke Health Services, Inc., Allen Mirzaei, Michael J. Munro, Manonmani Antony, Michael James Ward, Bradley Lemon, Claude J. Dimarco and William Robert Doran
Case Number: 1:2020cv01648
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Tarek M. Waked Hammoud, Michael James Ward.(McLaughlin, John)
January 28, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Manonmani Antony, Claude J. Dimarco, William Robert Doran, Bradley Lemon, Samuel K. Miller, Allen Mirzaei, Michael J. Munro.(McLaughlin, John)
January 11, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Nanticoke Health Services, Inc..(Cole, Andrew)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Answer or Respond to Complaint to January 28, 2021 filed by Michael J. Munro, Allen Mirzaei, Bradley Lemon, William Robert Doran, Claude J. Dimarco, Manonmani Antony, Samuel K. Miller, #19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Answer or Respond to Complaint to January 28, 2021 filed by Tarek M. Waked Hammoud, Michael James Ward, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Manonmani Antony answer due 1/28/2021; Claude J. Dimarco answer due 1/28/2021; William Robert Doran answer due 1/28/2021; Bradley Lemon answer due 1/28/2021; Samuel K. Miller answer due 1/28/2021; Allen Mirzaei answer due 1/28/2021; Michael J. Munro answer due 1/28/2021; Tarek M. Waked Hammoud answer due 1/28/2021; Michael James Ward answer due 1/28/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/29/2020. (fms)
December 28, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Answer or Respond to Complaint to January 28, 2021 - filed by Tarek M. Waked Hammoud, Michael James Ward. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McLaughlin, John)
December 28, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Answer or Respond to Complaint to January 28, 2021 - filed by Manonmani Antony, Claude J. Dimarco, William Robert Doran, Bradley Lemon, Samuel K. Miller, Allen Mirzaei, Michael J. Munro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McLaughlin, John)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant Nanticoke Health Services, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to January 11, 2021 filed by Nanticoke Health Services, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Nanticoke Health Services, Inc. answer due 1/11/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/28/2020. (nmf)
December 23, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant Nanticoke Health Services, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to January 11, 2021 - filed by Nanticoke Health Services, Inc.. (Cole, Andrew)
December 23, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. Samuel K. Miller served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Falgowski, J.)
December 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. McLaughlin, Jr on behalf of Tarek M. Waked Hammoud, Michael James Ward (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McLaughlin, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. McLaughlin, Jr on behalf of Manonmani Antony, Claude J. Dimarco, William Robert Doran, Bradley Lemon, Samuel K. Miller, Allen Mirzaei, Michael J. Munro (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McLaughlin, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. Michael J. Munro served on 12/17/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. (Falgowski, J.)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. Claude J. Dimarco served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (Falgowski, J.)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. Manonmani Antony served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (Falgowski, J.)
December 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. Bradley Lemon served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Falgowski, J.)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. William Robert Doran served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Falgowski, J.)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. Allen Mirzaei served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Falgowski, J.)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. Tarek M. Waked Hammoud served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Falgowski, J.)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. Michael James Ward served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Falgowski, J.)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Nanticoke Health Services, Inc. on December 7, 2020, filed by Truist Bank., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. Nanticoke Health Services, Inc. served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Falgowski, J.)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Truist Bank. (Falgowski, J.)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (amf)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Manonmani Antony, Claude J. Dimarco, William Robert Doran, Bradley Lemon, Samuel K. Miller, Allen Mirzaei, Michael J. Munro, Nanticoke Health Services, Inc., Tarek M. Waked Hammoud, and Michael James Ward - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3373807.) - filed by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truist Bank v. Nanticoke Health Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truist Bank
Represented By: J. Cory Falgowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: J. Cory Falgowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel K. Miller
Represented By: John D. McLaughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarek M. Waked Hammoud
Represented By: John D. McLaughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanticoke Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lynch Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Mirzaei
Represented By: John D. McLaughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Munro
Represented By: John D. McLaughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manonmani Antony
Represented By: John D. McLaughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael James Ward
Represented By: John D. McLaughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Lemon
Represented By: John D. McLaughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude J. Dimarco
Represented By: John D. McLaughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Robert Doran
Represented By: John D. McLaughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?