Johnson v. Brady et al
Plaintiff: Marcus J. Johnson
Defendant: CO Timothy Brady, Warden Robert May, Cpl McCormick, John Does #1-28, Randall Dotson and Security Superintendent
Case Number: 1:2020cv01732
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert May, McCormick.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2021. (Song, Rebecca)
February 8, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Opening Brief filed as an attachment to the motion at D.I. 11 has been removed. Motions and briefs are to be filed independent of each other. Counsel shall refile the Opening Brief accordingly. (nms)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Timothy Brady, Robert May, McCormick. (Attachments: #2 Proposed Order)(Song, Rebecca) Modified on 2/8/2021 (nms).
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Timothy Brady, Robert May, McCormick, Randall Dotson, Security Superintendent, and John Does #1-28, filed by Marcus J. Johnson.(amf)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Timothy Brady, Robert May, McCormick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Song, Rebecca)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 Letter to Marcus J. Johnson, from the Clerk of Court, regarding request for copywork. (mal) Modified on 1/5/2021 (nms).
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marcus J. Johnson.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/12/2021. (apk)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to the Clerk of Court, from Marcus Johnson, regarding request for copywork. (mal) Modified on 1/5/2021 (nms).
December 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Timothy Brady, Robert May, McCormick.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/4/2021. (Song, Rebecca)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Timothy Brady, Robert May, McCormick. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting 12(b)(6) Motion to dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service)(Song, Rebecca)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Song on behalf of Timothy Brady, Robert May, McCormick (Song, Rebecca)
December 21, 2020 Remark: Copy of docket sent to Pro Se Plaintiff. (nmg)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N20C-11-146 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3410933)- filed by Robert May, McCormick, Timothy Brady. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Brady et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Timothy Brady
Represented By: Rebecca Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Robert May
Represented By: Rebecca Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl McCormick
Represented By: Rebecca Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-28
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?