In Re: Woodbolt Distribution, LLC
Petitioner: BPI Sports, LLC
Respondent: Woodbolt Distribution, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020mc00158
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Beth A. Swadley regarding Woodbolt Distribution, LLC's response to Petitioner's Letter of June 26, 2020 - re #18 Letter. (Swadley, Beth)
June 26, 2020 Filing 18 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Stephen B. Brauerman regarding Follow up to Letter dated June 22, 2020 - re #16 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Beth A. Swadley regarding Woodbolt Distribution, LLC's response to Petitioner's Letter of June 22, 2020 - re #16 Letter. (Swadley, Beth)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Stephen B. Brauerman regarding Order from Southern District of Florida. (Brauerman, Stephen)
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Beth A. Swadley regarding Woodbolt Distribution, LLC's position on transfer of case - re Telephone Conference,. (Swadley, Beth)
June 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Telephone Conference held on 6/11/2020 regarding the Motion to Compel ( #1 ). The Court reserves ruling on the motion until respondent informs the Court of their client's position as discussed, which is due on 6/15/2020. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (mdb)
June 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory L. Hillyer - filed by BPI Sports, LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Javier Sobrado - filed by BPI Sports, LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 SUR-REPLY BRIEF re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(dlw)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to BPI Sports, LLC's Motion to Compel (D.I. 1). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/10/2020. (dlw)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Javier Sobrado filed by BPI Sports, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/10/2020. (dlw)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory L. Hillyer filed by BPI Sports, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/10/2020. (dlw)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to BPI Sports, LLC's Motion to Compel (D.I. 1) [UNOPPOSED] - filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Swadley, Beth) Modified on 6/10/2020 (dlw).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephone Conference on the #1 Motion to Compel is set for 6/11/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Counsel for BPI Sports, LLC shall provide a dial-in for the teleconference by emailing this Court's judicial administrator. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/8/2020. (dlw)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by BPI Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Brauerman, Stephen)
June 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Svetlana K. Ivy for Woodbolt Distribution, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Svetlana K. Ivy filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/1/2020. (dlw)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Svetlana K. Ivy - filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Swadley, Beth)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Swadley, Beth)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Beth A. Swadley re #5 Answering Brief in Opposition by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 A-Dismissal Order, #2 B-BPI's Motion for Leave to Amend, #3 C-BPI's April 14, 2020 Letter, #4 D-April 17, 2020 E-mail Chain between Svetlana K. Ivy, Esq. and Gregory Hillyer, Esq., #5 E-Woodbolt's April 22, 2020 Letter and Supplemental Responses, #6 F-May 1, 2020 Email by Svetlana K. Ivy, Esq., #7 G-BPI's Objections and Responses to ThermoLife's Requests for Production, #8 H-ThermoLife's Responses to BPI's Requests for Production, #9 I-BPI's Motion to Compel, #10 J-Joint Status Report)(Swadley, Beth) Modified on 6/1/2020 (dlw).
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2020. (Swadley, Beth)
May 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BPI Sports, LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
May 7, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by BPI Sports, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(nmg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel - filed by BPI Sports, LLC. (Filing Fee $47, receipt number ADEDC-2920090) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Woodbolt Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Woodbolt Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Beth Ann Swadley
Represented By: Svetlana K. Ivy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BPI Sports, LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?